Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259199

EP1259199 - SHROUDS FOR IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2005  [2005/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BUEHLER, Knute
1122 Foxwood Place
Bend, OR 97701 / US
02 / KELMAN, David, C.
10306 West Shrewsbury Run
Collierville, TN 38017 / US
03 / JONES, Jerry, L.
5607 Confederate Circle E.
Memphis, TN 38125 / US
04 / SHEA, Jeffrey, J.
2059 Shadowood Cove
Memphis, TN 38119 / US
05 / AUSTIN, William, B.
1802 Liles Lane
Collierville, TN 38017 / US
06 / LAMBERT, Richard, D.
2115 Oaklawn Lane
Germantown, TN 38018 / US
 [2003/05]
Former [2002/48]01 / BUEHLER, Knute
1122 Foxwood Place
Bend, OR 97701 / US
02 / KELMAN, David, C.
10306 West Shrewsbury Run
Collierville, TN 38017 / US
03 / JONES, Jerry, L.
5607 Confederate Circle E.
Memphis, TN 38125 / US
04 / SHEA, Jeffrey, J.
2059 Shadowood Cove
Memphis, TN 38119 / US
05 / AUSTIN, William, B.
8177 Waverly Crossing
Germantown, TN 38138 / US
06 / LAMBERT, Richard, D.
8428 Ridge Fall Cove
Cordova, TN 38018 / US
Representative(s)Draggett, Peter Thornton
Group Patents & Trade Marks Dept.
Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington
York Y010 5DF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Draggett, Peter Thornton
Group Patents & Trade Marks Dept., Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre, York Science Park
Heslington, York Y010 5DF / GB
Application number, filing date01914492.226.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001US06052
Priority number, dateUS20000186473P02.03.2000         Original published format: US 186473 P
US2000055137518.04.2000         Original published format: US 551375
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0164143
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1259199
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:POSITIONIERUNGSHÜLSE FÜR IMPLANTATE[2002/48]
English:SHROUDS FOR IMPLANTS[2002/48]
French:EPAULEMENT POUR IMPLANTS[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase02.08.2002National basic fee paid 
02.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
25.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/44]
01.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0940128  (BENOIST GIRARD & CIE [FR]) [X] 1-26,29,30,33-46,49-60,63,64 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0940127  (BENOIST GIRARD & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-26,29,30,33-46,49-60,63,64 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0207873  (OUEST MEDICAL & CHIRURG [FR]) [A] 1-26,29,30,33-46,49-60,63,64 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5989259  (PENENBERG BRAD [US], et al) [A] 1-26,29,30,33-46,49-60,63,64 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]CH685423  (SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFTPROTE) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4936863  (HOFMANN AARON A [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *