Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259583

EP1259583 - METAL WORKING LUBRICANTS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.03.2006  [2006/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BOTZ, Frank, K.
1397 Shoemaker Drive
Westland, MI 48185-7700 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Endres, Helmut
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Endres, Helmut
Henkel KGaA Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01914538.228.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001US06268
Priority number, dateUS20000186165P29.02.2000         Original published format: US 186165 P
US20000218370P13.07.2000         Original published format: US 218370 P
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0164822
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1259583
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:C10M173/02, // (C10M173/02, 125:10, 129:30, 129:38, 129:48, 145:36), C10M145:38,(C10N10/02, 40:22, 40:24)
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:METALLVERARBEITUNGSSCHMIERMITTEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2002/48]
English:METAL WORKING LUBRICANTS AND THEIR USE[2002/48]
French:LUBRIFIANTS POUR LE TRAVAIL DES METAUX ET UTILISATIONS DE CES DERNIERS[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2002National basic fee paid 
19.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
01.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/11]
29.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19649102  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,12,16-18 * page 2, line 48 - line 65 * * page 4, line 25 - line 30; examples E1-E2 *;
 [X]GB833868  (SHELL RES LTD) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,16-18 * page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 94 * * page 3, line 57 - line 59; examples I-III *;
 [X]US3041281  (WINSOR PHILIP A, et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,16-18 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 40 * * column 4, line 47 - line 57; claims 1-5; table 1 *;
 [X]US2989465  (ALAN LLOYD KENNETH, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,16-18 * column 1, line 38 - line 55; examples 1-4 *;
 [X]FR1423085  (KUHLMANN ETS) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,16-18 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, column 2, paragraphs 1-3 *;
 [X]US5484541  (PRZYBYLSKI GERALD W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,16-18 * the whole document *