Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254306

EP1254306 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIMULTANEOUS REGULATION OF AN INTAKE AIR FLOW FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A SECONDARY AIR FLOW IN THE EXHAUST SYSTEM OF THE SAME INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mann + Hummel GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2003/51]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH
71631 Ludwigsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PAFFRATH, Holger
Albrecht-Dürer-Strasse 50
50259 Pulheim / DE
02 / HUMMEL, Karl, Ernst
Dianastrasse 9
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
03 / FISCHER, Jochem
Dresdner Weg 20
71672 Marbach / DE
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH
71631 Ludwigsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Application number, filing date01915151.319.01.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001EP00603
Priority number, dateDE200010588810.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10005888
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0159273
Date:16.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254306
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254306
Date:22.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/32, F02D9/02
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN EINSTELLUNG EINES ANSAUGLUFTSTROMS FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND EINES SEKUNDÄRLUFTSTROMS IN DIE ABGASANLAGE DERSELBEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2002/45]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIMULTANEOUS REGULATION OF AN INTAKE AIR FLOW FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A SECONDARY AIR FLOW IN THE EXHAUST SYSTEM OF THE SAME INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2002/45]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE REGLAGE SIMULTANE D'UN FLUX D'AIR D'ASPIRATION POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET D'UN FLUX D'AIR SECONDAIRE DANS LE CIRCUIT D'ECHAPPEMENT DU MEME MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2002National basic fee paid 
14.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
09.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2005Fee for grant paid
16.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
IE22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
TR22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
IE22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2008/29]FI22.03.2006
IE22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2008/19]IE22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/36]IE22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/12]IE22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/10]NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2006/50]NL22.03.2006
SE22.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
Former [2006/45]NL22.03.2006
SE22.06.2006
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE1476578  (MORRIS CHARLES WILLIAM) [X] 1,4,9 * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 2 * [A] 11;
 [DY]WO9738212  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE], et al) [DY] 1,2,4,5 * page 4, paragraph 7 * * page 6, paragraph 2; figures 3,8 *;
 [Y]US3299629  (BOUCHARD CONSTANT L) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 23 - line 25 * * column 1, line 43 - line 49 * * column 2, line 7 - line 10 * * column 2, line 31 - line 54 * * column 2, line 65 - line 69 * * column 3, line 15 - line 30 * * column 3, line 45 - line 63 * * column 4, line 20 - line 26 *;
 [A]DE4219267  (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 3 - line 12 * * column 1, line 32 - line 67 *;
 [E]DE19937781  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [E] 1,4,9 * column 1, line 13 - line 20 * * column 2, line 42 - line 44 * * column 3, line 12 - line 17 * * column 5, line 25 - line 36 * * column 5, line 45 - line 54 *
by applicantWO9738212