Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264102

EP1264102 - CAPSULE FOR AN INJECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.11.2006  [2006/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / NOBIS, Wolfgang
Lena-Christ-Str. 1
80807 München / DE
 [2002/50]
Application number, filing date01915244.614.02.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001EP01616
Priority number, dateDE200011283416.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10012834
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0169077
Date:20.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264102
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1264102
Date:21.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02M63/00, F02M69/46, F02M35/104, F02M69/04, F02M63/02
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2004/22]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAPSEL FÜR EIN EINSPRITZSYSTEM[2002/50]
English:CAPSULE FOR AN INJECTION SYSTEM[2002/50]
French:CAPSULE POUR SYSTEME D'INJECTION[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2002National basic fee paid 
18.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
08.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2005Fee for grant paid
13.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US4046128  (FORMIA ANTONIO) [X] 1-3,5,7 * column 3, line 21 - line 68; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5479900  (BODENHAUSEN ECKHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 19 - column 5, line 61; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4716879  (TAKAYAMA TERUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 17 - line 68; figure - *;
 [A]US5353767  (CARBONE DONALD T [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7 * column 2, line 62 - column 6, line 10; figure - *
by applicantDE4002393