Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255573

EP1255573 - COMPOSITIONs comprising monoperphthalic acid useful for treating contact lens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/46]CONTACT LENS TREATING METHOD AND COMPOSITION
[2004/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI  TR 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2004/14]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI  TR 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [2003/11]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [2003/10]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Vienna / AT
Former [2002/46]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunnerstrasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / TSAO, Fu-Pao
1361 Pinehurst Hunt
Lawrenceville, GA 30043 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Gros, Florent , et al
Novartis AG
4002 Basel / CH
[2002/46]
Application number, filing date01915249.514.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001EP01630
Priority number, dateUS20000183068P16.02.2000         Original published format: US 183068 P
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160421
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255573
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255573
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61L12/12, C11D3/00
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN enthaltend Monoperphthalatsäure ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KONTAKTLINSEN[2004/02]
English:COMPOSITIONs comprising monoperphthalic acid useful for treating contact lens[2004/02]
French:COMPOSITIONs comprenant l'acide monoperphthalic utilisées pour le traitement de LENTILLES DE CONTACT[2004/02]
Former [2002/46]VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KONTAKTLINSEN
Former [2002/46]CONTACT LENS TREATING METHOD AND COMPOSITION
Former [2002/46]PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION UTILISES POUR TRAITER DES LENTILLES DE CONTACT
Entry into regional phase21.06.2002National basic fee paid 
21.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
07.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2004Fee for grant paid
28.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
PT01.02.2005
CY14.02.2005
IE14.02.2005
LU14.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/20]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
CY14.02.2005
IE14.02.2005
LU14.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2007/10]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
IE14.02.2005
LU14.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/51]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
IE14.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/23]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
IE14.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/14]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
MC28.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/28]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/27]AT01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/21]AT01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI01.09.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE01.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0974368  (BODE CHEMIE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-29 * column 2, paragraph 8 - column 5, paragraph 19 *;
 [DX]GB2178189  (SAUFLON PHARM LTD) [DX] 1-29 * claims 1,4,5,8 *;
 [A]US5366694  (STOCKEL RICHARD F [US]) [A] 1-29 * column 4, line 53 - line 66 * * claims 1,5 *;
 [DA]WO8701562  (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [DA] 1-29 * the whole document *