Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1266419

EP1266419 - MIXED REACTANT FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.09.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CMR Fuel Cells (UK) Limited
Harston Mill Harston
Cambridge CB2 5GG / GB
[2007/24]
Former [2004/30]For all designated states
CMR Fuel Cells Limited
Harston Mill, Harston
Cambridge, CB2 5GG / GB
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED
Harston Mill
Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PRIESTNALL, Michael, A., Scientific Generics Ltd.
Harston Mill
Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
02 / EVANS, Michael, J, c/o Scientific Generics Limited
Harston Mill
Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
03 / SHAFFER, Milo, Sebastian, Peter
55 Bateman Street
Cambridge CB2 1LR / GB
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Lipscombe, Martin John , et al
Nash Matthews LLP
24 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/41]Lipscombe, Martin John , et al
Keith W Nash & Co, 90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
Former [2002/51]Jones, William
i.p.21 Limited Norwich Research Park
Colney Norwich NR4 7UT / GB
Application number, filing date01915493.926.03.2001
[2002/51]
WO2001GB01322
Priority number, dateGB2000000730624.03.2000         Original published format: GB 0007306
GB2000001962209.08.2000         Original published format: GB 0019622
GB2000001962309.08.2000         Original published format: GB 0019623
GB2000002503012.10.2000         Original published format: GB 0025030
GB2000002693503.11.2000         Original published format: GB 0026935
GB2000002758710.11.2000         Original published format: GB 0027587
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0173880
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1266419
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/10, H01M8/08, H01M8/22
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZELLEN MIT GEMISCHTEM REAGENZ[2002/51]
English:MIXED REACTANT FUEL CELLS[2002/51]
French:PILES A COMBUSTIBLE A REACTIFS MIXTES[2002/51]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2002National basic fee paid 
04.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
15.09.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
17.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200404   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0313306  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,21,22 * page 6, line 10 - line 20; claims 1-15 *;
 [A]US3719529  (LAKE D) [A] 1-29 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US4248941  (LOUIS GEORGE A, et al) [A] 1-29 * claims 1-21 *;
 [DA]  - RIESS I ET AL, "Solid oxide fuel cells operating on uniform mixtures of fuel and air", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951115), vol. 82, no. 1, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 1 - 4, XP004050226 [DA] 1-29 * page 1 - page 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2738(95)00210-W