Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1184987

EP1184987 - PHASE-LOCKED LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
For all designated states
NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Shibuya Mark City, 1-12-1 Dogenzaka, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
[2006/24]
Former [2002/10]For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
For all designated states
NTT Electronics Corporation
Shibuya Mark City, 1-12-1 Dogenzaka, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOSAKA, Hideyuki, NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
02 / FUKUYAMA, Hiroyuki, NTT Intellectual Property Ctr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
03 / KAMITSUNA, Hideki, NTT Intellectual Property Ctr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
04 / MURAGUCHI, Masahiro
509, 21-1, Kamioookahigashi 1-chome, Kounan-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 233-0001 / JP
05 / YONEYAMA, Mikio
302, 861-1-5, Ishida
Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1116 / JP
06 / SASAKI, Hiroaki
M502, 27-4, Ooya
Ebina-shi, Kanagawa 243-0411 / JP
 [2002/10]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/10]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01915659.521.03.2001
[2002/10]
WO2001JP02215
Priority number, dateJP2000007793421.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000077934
JP2000020185104.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000201851
[2002/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0171921
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1184987
Date:06.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2002/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1184987
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.09.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/10
[2002/10]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2002/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHASENREGELSCHLEIFE[2002/10]
English:PHASE-LOCKED LOOP[2002/10]
French:BOUCLE A PHASE ASSERVIE[2002/10]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2001Translation filed 
20.11.2001National basic fee paid 
20.11.2001Search fee paid 
20.11.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/22]
10.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2006Fee for grant paid
21.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/04]
Former [2007/36]IT14.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5719908  (GREEFF ROY EDGAR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,17 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 29; figures 3,4 * [A] 4,6,8,10,12,14,16-20,22,24;
 [X]EP0412491  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8,13,14 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 11; figures 2,5,6 *;
 [X]EP0308285  (TONNA ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,15,16 * page 4, line 52 - page 5, line 14; figure 6 *;
 [X]US5382922  (GERSBACH JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1,15,16 * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 35; figure 1 *
International search[A]JPH02311021  (SONY CORP)