Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263871

EP1263871 - BIODEGRADABLE THERMOPLASTIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/37]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FISCHER, Hartmut, Rudolf
Dalkruid 13
NL-5731 TP Mierlo / NL
02 / FISCHER, Sabine
Dalkruid 13
NL-5731 TP Mierlo / NL
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01915919.313.03.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001NL00206
Priority number, dateEP2000020089613.03.2000         Original published format: EP 00200896
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0168762
Date:20.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1263871
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1263871
Date:08.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08K13/02, C08L1/00, // (C08K13/02, 3:34), C08K5:00
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIOABBAUBARES THERMOPLASTISCHES MATERIAL[2002/50]
English:BIODEGRADABLE THERMOPLASTIC MATERIAL[2002/50]
French:MATERIAU THERMOPLASTIQUE BIODEGRADABLE[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2002National basic fee paid 
11.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.09.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
21.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2004Fee for grant paid
21.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
TR08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
PT08.02.2005
CY13.03.2005
LU13.03.2005
IE14.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/26]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
TR08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
CY13.03.2005
LU13.03.2005
IE14.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/20]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
TR08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
CY13.03.2005
IE14.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/10]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
TR08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
IE14.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/51]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
TR08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
IE14.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/23]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
IE14.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2005/46]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/28]AT08.09.2004
BE08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/21]AT08.09.2004
CH08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
LI08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI08.09.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE08.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0691381  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-16 *;
 [A]US4737582  (GOLDMAN STEPHEN A [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-5 *