Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1268700

EP1268700 - ADHESIVE SYSTEM COMPRISING ETHERIFIED AMINO RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2017Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 03.05.2017  [2017/18]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
[2016/31]
Former [2006/23]For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
For:SE 
Casco Adhesives AB
Box 11538
100 61 Stockholm / SE
Former [2005/24]For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
For:SE 
Casco Adhesives AB
Box 11538
100 61 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/47]For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Akzo Nobel N.V.
P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
For:SE 
Casco Adhesives AB
Box 11538
100 61 Stockholm / SE
Former [2003/01]For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Akzo Nobel N.V.
P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
For:SE 
Casco Products AB
Box 11538
100 61 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NASLI-BAKIR, Benyahia
Centralvägen 4D
S-132 40 Saltsjö-Boo / SE
02 / LINDBERG, Stefan
Lagmansvägen 33
S-186 42 Vallentuna / SE
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Akzo Nobel IP Department
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
[2017/18]
Former [2014/34]De Vries, Adriaan Jacobus , et al
Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 Velperweg 76
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Former [2008/34]Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis , et al
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Former [2003/01]Jönsson, Christer , et al
Eka Chemicals AB, Patent Department, Box 11556
100 61 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date01915994.616.03.2001
[2003/01]
WO2001SE00547
Priority number, dateEP2000085004820.03.2000         Original published format: EP 00850048
US20000190553P20.03.2000         Original published format: US 190553 P
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0170898
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1268700
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1268700
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1268700
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09J161/28
[2003/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2017/18]
Former [2003/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesAL28.08.2002
LT28.08.2002
LV28.08.2002
MK28.08.2002
RO28.08.2002
SI28.08.2002
TitleGerman:KLEBSTOFFSYSTEM ENTHALTEND VERETHERTE AMINOPLASTHARZE[2003/01]
English:ADHESIVE SYSTEM COMPRISING ETHERIFIED AMINO RESINS[2003/01]
French:SYSTEME ADHESIF CONTENANT DES RESINES AMINO ETHERIFIEES[2003/01]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2002National basic fee paid 
28.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
28.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.08.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
04.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2006Fee for grant paid
01.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.03.2007  12.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Dynea OY
Siltasaarenkatu 18-20A
00530 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 [2016/15]
Former [2016/13]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2007  12.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Dynea AS
Svelleveien 33
2001 Lilleström / NO
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
Former [2013/06]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2007  12.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Dynea OY
Siltasaarenkatu 18-20A
00530 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2007/16]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2007  12.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Dynea OY
Siltasaarenkatu 18-20A
00530 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Plischke, Manfred, et al
Ahornweg 18
61449 Steinbach Ts. / DE
24.04.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.10.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
17.05.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.05.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.03.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.01.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.03.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1563/13
26.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
08.03.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
08.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.03.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.06.2006
TR07.06.2006
PT07.11.2006
IE16.03.2007
LU16.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY07.06.2006
PT07.11.2006
IE16.03.2007
LU16.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/10]PT07.11.2006
IE16.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/09]PT07.11.2006
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/04]PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/36]IT07.06.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/12]PT07.11.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]DE2158604  (UVA VERWALTUNGSANSTALT) [X] 2,6,7,9,10,14 * example 7 * * page 5, line 29 *;
 [X]US4940481  (MUELLER URS [CH], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,11,12 * claim 1 * * column 7, line 1 - line 15 * * column 4, line 44 - line 45 *;
 [X]JPS58120661  ;
 [X]EP0368215  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,9 * example 3 *;
 [X]EP0176709  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,13 * page 4, line 25 - line 42 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831006), vol. 007, no. 225, Database accession no. (C - 189), & JP58120661 A 19830718 (SUMITOMO KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,5,7-9 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1983-744611 [X] 1,5,7-9 * abstract *
ExaminationUS4940841
 EP0501174
OppositionEP0427058
 EP0368215
 US5434216
 US5190983
 WO9967028
 US3301809
 US5182328
 EP0623661
 US4521561
 US5545684
    - IMAM S. ET AL, "Wood adhesive from crosslinked poly(vinyl alcohol) and partially gelatinized starch: preparation and properties", STARKE-STARCH, (19990601), vol. 51, no. 6, pages 225 - 229
    - EN 391, European Committee for Standardization (CEN), Brussels, 1995
    - EN 386, European Committee for Standardization (CEN), Brussels, 1995
    - UCar Vehicle 443, Union Carbide Corp., US, 1986
    - HALLENSLEBEN M. ET AL, Ullmann's Encyclopedia od Industrial Chemistry, VCH PUBLISHERS, INC., (19921231), vol. A21, pages 743 - 746
    - Declaration by Benyahia Nasli-Bakir, 03-12-2012
    - Supplementary Gluing tests; No date
    - Declaration by Kristin Grøstad, 22-01-2013
    - Curriculum Vitae Kristin Grøstad; No date
    - CHUGG, W.W., GLULAM,The theory and practice of the manufacture of glued laminated timber structures, LONDON, ERNEST BENN LIMITED, (19641231), vol. CHAPT.15, pages 194 - 201
    - Technical data sheet: Kuraray Poval, November 2007
    - Technical data sheet: Kuraray Mowiol, December 2008
    - Technical data sheet: Kuraray Exceval Polymers, November 2007
    - Products data and characteristics of Vinavil adhesives; No date
    - Technical data sheet: Prefere 4270, January 2009