blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1272281

EP1272281 - DEVICE FOR DISPENSING SUBSTANCE FROM A CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCOTT, William M.
345 Descente 2
Ogden, Québec J0B 3E3 / CA
For all designated states
WELDON, Christopher
1225 Grand Rang
Ste Clotilde, Québec J0L 1WO / CA
[2003/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/02]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date01916805.328.03.2001
[2003/02]
WO2001CA00396
Priority number, dateUS2000053987431.03.2000         Original published format: US 539874
[2003/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0174498
Date:11.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1272281
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1272281
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2002
ClassificationIPC:B05C17/01
[2003/02]
CPC:
B05C17/00516 (EP,US); B05C17/00596 (EP); B05C17/0103 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE EINER SUBSTANZ AUS EINER KARTUSCHE[2003/02]
English:DEVICE FOR DISPENSING SUBSTANCE FROM A CARTRIDGE[2003/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE D'UNE CARTOUCHE[2003/02]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2002National basic fee paid 
30.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
20.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
16.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2005Fee for grant paid
18.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.06.2005
BE01.06.2005
CH01.06.2005
CY01.06.2005
FI01.06.2005
FR01.06.2005
IT01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
NL01.06.2005
TR01.06.2005
DK01.09.2005
GR01.09.2005
SE01.09.2005
ES12.09.2005
PT07.11.2005
[2009/01]
Former [2008/37]AT01.06.2005
BE01.06.2005
CH01.06.2005
FI01.06.2005
IT01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
NL01.06.2005
TR01.06.2005
DK01.09.2005
GR01.09.2005
SE01.09.2005
ES12.09.2005
PT07.11.2005
Former [2007/36]AT01.06.2005
BE01.06.2005
CH01.06.2005
FI01.06.2005
IT01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
NL01.06.2005
DK01.09.2005
GR01.09.2005
SE01.09.2005
ES12.09.2005
PT07.11.2005
Former [2006/26]AT01.06.2005
BE01.06.2005
CH01.06.2005
FI01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
NL01.06.2005
DK01.09.2005
GR01.09.2005
SE01.09.2005
ES12.09.2005
PT07.11.2005
Former [2006/22]AT01.06.2005
BE01.06.2005
CH01.06.2005
FI01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
NL01.06.2005
GR01.09.2005
SE01.09.2005
ES12.09.2005
PT07.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT01.06.2005
BE01.06.2005
CH01.06.2005
FI01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
GR01.09.2005
SE01.09.2005
ES12.09.2005
PT07.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT01.06.2005
BE01.06.2005
FI01.06.2005
SE01.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI01.06.2005
SE01.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE01.09.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]CA1118729  (CORRIVEAU JULIEN) [X] 1,2* claim 1 *;
 [X]DE3431291  (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]DE3437306  (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]US4653675  (RATZKY REINER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 65 *;
 [X]WO9522411  (CERON STEFANIA [IT]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.