Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264180

EP1264180 - SENSOR ELEMENT FOR OPTICALLY DETECTING CHEMICAL OR BIOCHEMICAL ANALYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - applicantpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WALDHÄUSL, Ralf
Tatzendpromenade 30
07745 Jena / DE
02 / DANZ, Norbert
Pforte 2
07747 Jena / DE
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
An der Frauenkirche 20
01067 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20
01067 Dresden / DE
Former [2002/50]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Gostritzer Strasse 61-63
01217 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date01916889.716.02.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001DE00672
Priority number, dateDE200011279313.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10012793
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0169256
Date:20.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1264180
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, G01N21/55
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENSORELEMENT ZUR OPTISCHEN DETEKTION VON CHEMISCHEN ODER BIOCHEMISCHEN ANALYTEN[2002/50]
English:SENSOR ELEMENT FOR OPTICALLY DETECTING CHEMICAL OR BIOCHEMICAL ANALYTES[2002/50]
French:ELEMENT CAPTEUR POUR LA DETECTION OPTIQUE D'ANALYTES CHIMIQUES OU BIOCHIMIQUES[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2002National basic fee paid 
21.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
09.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/11]
16.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0971226  (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9-17 * column 41, line 40 - line 53 * * figure 10 *;
 [DY]WO9427137  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [DY] 1-7,9-17 * page 13, line 3 - line 26 * * figures 3,6 *;
 [A]US5639671  (BOGART GREGORY R [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 11, line 5 - line 20 * * column 38, line 22 - line 54 * * figure 12 *;
 [A]WO9635940  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-7,9-17 * page 5, line 12 - page 15, line 30 *;
 [A]WO9821571  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-7,9-17 * page 7, line 22 - line 26 *;
 [A]WO9954736  (BECKMAN COULTER INC [US]) [A] 1-7,9-17 * page 4, line 22 - line 30; claim 3 *;
 [A]WO9503538  (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM [LI], et al) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *