Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315662

EP1315662 - DEVICE FOR COUPLING TWO STORAGE AND/OR TRANSPORT MEANS WITH A SECURITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Buck Valve GmbH
Mauchener Strasse 14
79379 Müllheim / DE
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / KOCH, Martin
Johanniterweg 1
79395 Neuenburg / DE
02 / ELSÄSSER, Bernd
Grunerner Weg 1
79282 Ballrechten-Dottingen / DE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Weber-Bruls, Dorothée
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Weber-Bruls, Dorothée
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2003/23]Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, Dr.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01916906.906.03.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001DE00854
Priority number, dateDE2000214871U28.08.2000         Original published format: DE 20014871 U
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0218248
Date:07.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315662
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315662
Date:26.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65G69/18, F16L37/30
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM KUPPELN ZWEIER AUFBEWAHRUNGS- UND/ODER FÖRDERMITTEL MIT EINER SICHERUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2003/23]
English:DEVICE FOR COUPLING TWO STORAGE AND/OR TRANSPORT MEANS WITH A SECURITY DEVICE[2003/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COUPLAGE DE DEUX MOYENS DE STOCKAGE ET/OU D'ACHEMINEMENT AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2003National basic fee paid 
23.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
01.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2004Fee for grant paid
15.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
TR26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
PT26.10.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2006/51]FI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
TR26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2006/13]FI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/18]FI26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI26.05.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE26.08.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US5690152  (KOCH MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5540266  (GRAU GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,13 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 39 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]DE4415488  (REIMELT DIETRICH KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 42 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0554096  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 - column 7, line 13 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [PX]DE20014871U  (GEA POWDER TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19520409
 DE29915973U
 GB888541