Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236095

EP1236095 - DATA PROCESSOR WITH MULTI-COMMAND INSTRUCTION WORDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2007/31]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HOOGERBRUGGE, Jan
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/14]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2007/01]Pennings, Johannes , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/36]de Jong, Durk Jan
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date01916981.212.02.2001
[2002/36]
WO2001EP01463
Priority number, dateEP2000020067928.02.2000         Original published format: EP 00200679
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0165362
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236095
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236095
Date:14.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/38
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENPROZESSOR MIT MEHERERN BEFEHLEN UMFASSENDE BEFEHLSWÖRTERN[2002/36]
English:DATA PROCESSOR WITH MULTI-COMMAND INSTRUCTION WORDS[2002/36]
French:UNITE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES A MOTS INSTRUCTIONS A COMMANDE MULTIPLE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2001National basic fee paid 
07.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
30.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2010Fee for grant paid
08.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
CY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
TR14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
PT16.08.2010
[2013/44]
Former [2011/14]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
CY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/13]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
CY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/08]AT14.04.2010
CY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/07]AT14.04.2010
CY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
Former [2011/05]AT14.04.2010
CY14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
Former [2011/01]AT14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
Former [2010/50]AT14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
ES25.07.2010
Former [2010/49]AT14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
ES25.07.2010
Former [2010/46]NL14.04.2010
ES25.07.2010
Former [2010/45]NL14.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5414822  (SAITO MITSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 5, line 26 - column 7, line 57 *;
 [Y]EP0737915  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 9, line 7 - line 30 *;
 [A]US5664135  (SCHLANSKER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 26 *;
 [A]US5978908  (CUMMING PETER [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 50 * * column 6, line 15 - line 50 *
by applicantUS4833599
 US5903750
 US5414822