Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265912

EP1265912 - MASS1 GENE, A TARGET FOR ANTICONVULSANT DRUG DEVELOPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.11.2007  [2007/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Utah Research Foundation
Suite 110
615 Arapeen Drive
Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
The University of Utah Research Foundation
Suite 110, 615 Arapeen Drive
Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PTACEK, Louis, c/o University of Utah
15 North 2030 East, Room 4420
Salt Lake City, UT 84112-5331 / US
02 / WHITE, Steve, c/o University of Utah
15 North 2030 East, Room 4420
Salt Lake City, UT 84112-5331 / US
03 / FU, Ying-Hui, University of Utah
15 North 2030 East, Room 4420
Salt Lake City, UT 84112-5331 / US
04 / SKRADSKI, Shana, University of Utah
15 North 2030 East, Room 4420
Salt Lake City, UT 84112-5331 / US
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds, West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date01918340.902.03.2001
[2002/51]
WO2001US06962
Priority number, dateUS20000187209P03.03.2000         Original published format: US 187209 P
US20000222898P03.08.2000         Original published format: US 222898 P
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0165927
Date:13.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1265912
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.09.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47
[2004/30]
Former International [2002/51]C07K1/00, C07K14/00, C12N5/06, C12N5/08, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12P21/04, C12P21/06, G01N33/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:DAS GEN MASS1 ALS ZIEL FÜR DIE ENTWICKLUNG ANTIKONVULSIVER MEDKAMENTE[2002/51]
English:MASS1 GENE, A TARGET FOR ANTICONVULSANT DRUG DEVELOPMENT[2002/51]
French:LE GENE MASS1, UNE CIBLE POUR LE DEVELOPPEMENT DE MEDICAMENTS ANTICONVULSIFS[2002/51]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2002National basic fee paid 
02.10.2002Search fee paid 
02.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
02.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/46]
27.06.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  POUTSKA A ET AL., "Homo sapiens mRNA, partial cds", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. al133041, URL: EBI, XP002273138 [X] 1,11-18,28-36 * abstract *
 [XA]  BRENNAN T J ET AL, "Sound-induced seizures in serotonin 5-HT2c receptor mutant mice.", NATURE GENETICS. UNITED STATES AUG 1997, (199708), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 387 - 390, XP009027591 [X] 37-43 * abstract * * figure 2 * [A] 1-36

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0897-387
 [A]  PTACEK LOUIS J, "Ion channel diseases: Episodic disorders of the nervous system", SEMINARS IN NEUROLOGY, (1999), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 0271-8235, pages 363 - 370, XP009027522 [A] 1-43 * the whole document *
 [PX]  NIKKILA H ET AL, "Sequence similarities between a novel putative G protein-coupled receptor and Na+/Ca2+ exchangers define a cation binding domain.", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD.) UNITED STATES SEP 2000, (200009), vol. 14, no. 9, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 1351 - 1364, XP002273135 [PX] 1,11-18,28-36 * abstract * * figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.14.9.1351
 [T]  SKRADSKI S L ET AL, "A novel gene causing a mendelian audiogenic mouse epilepsy.", NEURON. UNITED STATES 30 AUG 2001, (20010830), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0896-6273, pages 537 - 544, XP002273137 [T] 1-43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(01)00397-X
International search[X]  - LEVIN ET AL., "Mapping DNA polymorphisms using PCR primers derived from the sequence of an avian CR1 element", J. HERED., (1994), vol. 85, no. 2, pages 73 - 78, XP002941812
 [AP]  - DUNN D. ET AL., "Mouse whole genome... plasmid inserts", DATABASE GENBANK, Database accession no. AZ664090, XP002941813
 [A]  - SKRADSKI ET AL., "Genetic mapping of a locus (mass1) causing audiogenic seizures in mice", GENOMICS, (1998), vol. 49, pages 188 - 192, XP002941814

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1998.5229
 [A]  - SKRADSKI ET AL., "Physical mapping of MASS1 and analysis of canditate genes for audiogenic seizures in frings mice", ABSTRACTS OF SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, (1998), vol. 24, no. PART 1, page ABSTRACT NO. 279.12, XP002941815