blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1272378

EP1272378 - AIR BAG TETHER CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Milliken & Company
920 Milliken Road
Spartanburg, SC 29303 / US
[2003/02]
Inventor(s)01 / KESHAVARAJ, Ramesh
305 Grovewood Lane
LaGrange GA 20269 / US
 [2003/19]
Former [2003/02]01 / KESHAVARAJ, Ramesh
114 Arbor Gate
Peachtree City, GA 30269 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01918479.509.03.2001
[2003/02]
WO2001US07556
Priority number, dateUS2000054928414.04.2000         Original published format: US 549284
[2003/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0179034
Date:25.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1272378
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1272378
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2002
ClassificationIPC:B60R21/16
[2003/02]
CPC:
B60R21/233 (EP,US); B60R21/2338 (EP,US); B60R2021/23382 (EP,US);
Y10T442/322 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONSTRUKTION EINES AIRBAG-HALTESEILS[2003/02]
English:AIR BAG TETHER CONSTRUCTION[2003/02]
French:CONSTRUCTION D'ATTACHE D'AIR BAG[2003/02]
Entry into regional phase10.10.2002National basic fee paid 
10.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
10.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2004Fee for grant paid
07.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
IT01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
PT01.02.2005
CY09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
LU09.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/36]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
IT01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
CY09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
LU09.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/26]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
CY09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
LU09.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/20]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
CY09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/10]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
IE09.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/51]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
IE09.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/23]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
IE09.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2005/46]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/28]AT01.09.2004
BE01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/27]AT01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/21]AT01.09.2004
CH01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
LI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT01.09.2004
FI01.09.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI01.09.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE01.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US4966389  (TAKADA JUICHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 16; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US5308113  (MORISET MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8,9 * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 23; figures 2,7 *;
 [X]EP0611683  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,8,10,11* page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 25; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.