blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1273159

EP1273159 - LEXICAL ANALYSIS OF TELEPHONE CONVERSATIONS WITH CALL CENTER AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.12.2005  [2005/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dragon Systems, Inc.
Suite 1225, 320 Nevada Street Newton
MA 02160 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]For all designated states
Dragon Systems, Inc.
Suite 1225, 320 Nevada Street
Newton, MA 02160 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YOUNG, Jonathan, Hood
47 Churchill Street
Newton, MA 02166 / US
02 / TRUE, Sean, D.
4 Red Top Road
Natick, MA 01760 / US
03 / RAY, David, Meyer
37 Cherry Street
Somervile, MA 02144 / US
04 / WAHLBERG, Jakob
Apart. 25, 155 Lexington Street
Auburndale, MA 02466 / US
05 / HOWES, Bradley, Ray
117 Chestnut Street 2
Waltham, MA 02453 / US
06 / MCA'NULTY, Megan, M.
124 Harding Street
Newton, MA 02465 / US
07 / MORSE, John, A.
57 Elmhurst Road
Newton, MA 02458-2232 / US
08 / JACKSON, Mark
146 Highland Avenue
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
 [2003/02]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven
Marks & Clerk
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Howe, Steven
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date01918909.123.03.2001
[2003/02]
WO2001US09131
Priority number, dateUS2000053515524.03.2000         Original published format: US 535155
[2003/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0174042
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1273159
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:H04M3/00
[2003/02]
CPC:
H04M3/51 (EP); G10L15/26 (EP); H04M2201/40 (EP);
H04M3/5175 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2003/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEXIKALISCHE ANALYSE VON TELEFONGESPRÄCHEN MIT ANRUFZENTRALENBEDIENSTEN[2003/02]
English:LEXICAL ANALYSIS OF TELEPHONE CONVERSATIONS WITH CALL CENTER AGENTS[2003/02]
French:ANALYSE D'APPELS[2003/02]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2002National basic fee paid 
23.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
03.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/51]
18.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003
31.03.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[E]EP1096767  (ROCKWELL ELECTRONIC COMMERCE C) [E] 1-4,6,12,29,30,32,33 * page 2, column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 18 * * page 4, column 5, line 40 - page 5, column 7, line 24 * * claims 1-3,18-20 *;
 [A]EP0981237  (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS) [A] 1,33 * abstract * * page 3, column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 28 * * claims 6-10 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.