Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259220

EP1259220 - SKIN CLEANSING GEL HAVING A HEATING EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/24]For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOLZ, Wolfhard
Edmundstrasse 26
47829 Krefeld / DE
02 / MEYER ZU SCHLOCHTERN-MARIC, Katrin
Dohlenweg 15
49324 Melle / DE
03 / WADLE, Armin
Willbecker Strasse 105
40699 Erkrath / DE
 [2002/48]
Application number, filing date01919314.320.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001EP01882
Priority number, dateDE200010925201.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10009252
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0164176
Date:07.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259220
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259220
Date:23.07.2008
Language:DE
[2008/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10, C11D17/00
[2007/31]
Former International [2002/48]A61K7/48, A61K7/50, C11D17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:WÄRMENDES HAUTREINIGUNGSGEL[2002/48]
English:SKIN CLEANSING GEL HAVING A HEATING EFFECT[2002/48]
French:GEL NETTOYANT POUR LA PEAU A EFFET CHAUFFANT[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase23.08.2002National basic fee paid 
23.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
27.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2007Fee for grant paid
19.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
IT23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
TR23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
GR24.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
LU20.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
IT23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
GR24.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
LU20.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/47]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
IT23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
GR24.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
BE28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/10]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
IT23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
BE28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/09]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
IT23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/42]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
IT23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/39]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
IT23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/23]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
IE23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/20]DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]BE791366  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-3,6 * siehe auch das gesamte Dokument *;; claim - *;
 [DX]DE19624870  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0518721  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 4, line 39 - line 51; claim 1 *;
 [X]US5747004  (GIANI PAOLA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0950400  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * examples 5-7; claims 1,3,6 *;
 [X]WO9730148  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1 * page 40, line 1 - line L *;
 [A]DE4227203  (KAO CORP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3141746  (BOERGARDTS SACHSENSTEIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *