Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258065

EP1258065 - HIGH POWER DISTRIBUTED FEEDBACK RIDGE WAVEGUIDE LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2016  [2016/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trumpf Photonics, Inc.
2601 U.S. Rte. 130 S
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
[2003/12]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Princeton Lightwave, Inc.
2601 U.S. Route 130 South
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ABELES, Joseph, H.
42 Cedar Lane, Apt. D
Highland Park, NJ 08904 / US
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Thibon, Laurent , et al
Cabinet Beaumont
4, Place Robert Schuman
B.P. 1529
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/18]Thibon, Laurent , et al
Cabinet Beaumont
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
Former [2002/47]de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date01920104.522.01.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001US02019
Priority number, dateUS20000176915P20.01.2000         Original published format: US 176915 P
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154240
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258065
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/225, G02F1/01, G02F1/313, G02F1/21, H01Q3/26, H01S5/10, H01S5/12, H01S5/20, H01S5/323, H01Q23/00
[2015/21]
Former International [2002/47]H01S5/30, H01S5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:RIPPENWELLENLEITER-LASER MIT VERTEILTER RÜCKKOPPELUNG UND HOHER AUSGANGSLEISTUNG[2015/23]
English:HIGH POWER DISTRIBUTED FEEDBACK RIDGE WAVEGUIDE LASER[2002/47]
French:LASER DE FORTE PUISSANCE AVEC UN GUIDE D'ONDES EN RUBAN A RETROACTION REPARTIE[2015/23]
Former [2002/47]HOCHLEISTUNGS-DISTRIBUTED-FEEDBACK-RIDGE-WELLENLEITERLASER
Former [2002/47]LASER DE FORTE PUISSANCE, EN GUIDE D'ONDES A ARETE A RETROACTION REPARTIE
Entry into regional phase13.08.2002National basic fee paid 
13.08.2002Search fee paid 
13.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
08.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/12]
04.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
18.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
22.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
23.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5818860  (GARBUZOV DMITRI ZALMANOVITCH [US], et al) [DA] * abstract * * column 4, line 17 - line 43 *
International search[Y]JPH09307184
 [Y]US4622673
 [Y]US4615032
 [Y]US5189679