blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1203941

EP1203941 - DEVICE FOR EVALUATING INTERNAL QUALITY OF VEGETABLE OR FRUIT, METHOD FOR WARM-UP OPERATION OF THE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MEASURING INTERNAL QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD.
11-1 Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8584 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]For all designated states
Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd.
11-1 Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8584 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIMOTO, H., Mitsubishi M & S Co., Ltd.
EI-Services Div., 1380-1, Haraichi
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP
02 / TANIGUCHI, Norio, Mitsubishi M & S Co., Ltd.
EI-Services Div., 1380-1, Haraichi
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Motoshi, Mitsubishi M & S Co., Ltd.
EI-Services Div., 1380-1, Haraichi
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP
04 / NISHIYAMA, Yoshihide, Mitsubishi S & M Co., Ltd
EI-Services Div., 1380-1, Haraichi
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP
 [2002/19]
Representative(s)Liedl, Christine, et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Liedl, Christine, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Hansmann & Vogeser Patentanwälte Postfach 70 08 60
81308 München / DE
Application number, filing date01921833.813.04.2001
[2002/19]
WO2001JP03196
Priority number, dateJP2000011152413.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000111524
JP2000023208531.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000232085
JP2000023208631.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000232086
JP2000026004230.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000260042
JP2000030388603.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000303886
JP2000032023620.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000320236
[2002/19]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0179814
Date:25.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1203941
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.10.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2005
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/27, G01N21/35, G01N21/47
[2003/25]
CPC:
G01N21/85 (EP,US); G01N21/31 (EP,US); G01N33/025 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0221 (EP,US); G01N2201/0618 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2002/19]G01N21/27
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/19]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER INNEREN QUALITÄT VON GEMÜSE ODER OBST UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERWÄRMEN DER VORRICHTUNG[2002/19]
English:DEVICE FOR EVALUATING INTERNAL QUALITY OF VEGETABLE OR FRUIT, METHOD FOR WARM-UP OPERATION OF THE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MEASURING INTERNAL QUALITY[2002/19]
French:DISPOSITIF DESTINE A EVALUER LA QUALITE INTERIEURE DE LEGUMES OU DE FRUITS, PROCEDE DE MISE EN TEMPERATURE AU MOYEN DU DISPOSITIF, ET PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA QUALITE INTERIEURE[2002/19]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2001Translation filed 
12.12.2001National basic fee paid 
12.12.2001Search fee paid 
05.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/19]
20.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2000088747  ;
 [A]JPH10202205  ;
 [A]JPH05288674  ;
 [A]JPH11173985  ;
 [X]JPS62144460  ;
 [A]JPH07333137  ;
 [A]JPH02143147  ;
 [A]JPS63246967  ;
 [A]JPH06300680  ;
 [A]JPH06300681  ;
 [A]JPH10206323  ;
 [A]US3781554  (VATEV P, et al) [A] 20-23 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US4124301  (POCOCK SYDNEY N) [A] 12-19 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5436457  (TOMITA KATSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 12-19 * figure 6 *;
 [A]WO9746856  (PSC INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US5736930  (CAPPELS RICHARD D [US]) [X] 12-19 * column 6, line 35 - line 55; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5791497  (CAMPBELL DUNCAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5834908  (BOLAND STEVEN H [US], et al) [X] 12-19 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]WO9852037  (SINCLAIR INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 7 *;
 [X]US5845002  (HECK RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 20-23 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0957353  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [A] 20-23 * figures 18,19 *;
 [A]EP0961112  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [A] 20-23 * figures 4-6 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000088747 A 20000331 (TAKAYA CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10202205 A 19980804 (KAJITSU HIHAKAI HINSHITSU KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940208), vol. 018, no. 078, Database accession no. (P - 1689), & JP05288674 A 19931102 (TOSHIHIKO YOSHIKAWA;OTHERS: 02) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11173985 A 19990702 (MITSUI MINING &SMELTING CO LTD) [A] 1-11,20-23 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871208), vol. 011, no. 376, Database accession no. (E - 563), & JP62144460 A 19870627 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 12-19 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07333137 A 19951222 (HORIBA LTD) [A] 12-19 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900816), vol. 014, no. 381, Database accession no. (P - 1093), & JP02143147 A 19900601 (SATAKE ENG CO LTD) [A] 12-19 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890209), vol. 013, no. 058, Database accession no. (E - 714), & JP63246967 A 19881013 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 12-19 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06300680 A 19941028 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 20-23 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06300681 A 19941028 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO LTD) [A] 20-23 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10206323 A 19980807 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO LTD) [A] 20-23 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH09297053  (KUBOTA KK);
 [Y]JPH10123047  (KUBOTA KK);
 [Y]JPH1144638  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND);
 [Y]JPH06288903  (KAJITSU HIHAKAI HINSHITSU KENK);
 [Y]JPH08201273  (KET KAGAKU KENKYUSHO KK);
 [Y]JPH085550  (KUBOTA KK);
 [Y]JPH02242136  (HORIBA LTD);
 [Y]JPH07333137  (HORIBA LTD);
 [A]JPH07229840  (SAIKA GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.