Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237983

EP1237983 - POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION, CURED MATERIAL THEREOF AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Showa Denko K.K.
13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
[2007/31]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / WATANABE, Takeo, CTRL R.LAB., SHOWA DENKO K.K.
1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP
02 / SATO, Takashi, CTRL RES. LAB., SHOWA DENKO K.K.
1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP
03 / TAGOSHI, Hirotaka, CTRL RES. LAB. SHOWA DENKO K.K.
1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2002/37]
Application number, filing date01922067.224.04.2001
[2002/37]
WO2001JP03537
Priority number, dateJP2000013047228.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000130472
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0183580
Date:08.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237983
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1237983
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08G65/18, C08G59/68
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND GEHÄRTETES HARZ DARAUS, VERFAHREN ZUR SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2002/37]
English:POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION, CURED MATERIAL THEREOF AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2002/37]
French:COMPOSITION POLYMERISABLE, MATERIAU DURCI CORRESPONDANT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2002National basic fee paid 
15.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
08.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2007Fee for grant paid
22.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
16.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
GB24.04.2008
IE24.04.2008
LU24.04.2008
IT30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
GB24.04.2008
IE24.04.2008
LU24.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2010/32]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
GB24.04.2008
IE24.04.2008
LU24.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/33]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
GB24.04.2008
IE24.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/29]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
GB24.04.2008
IE24.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/23]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
IE24.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/51]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/32]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
Former [2008/28]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/26]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/23]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/19]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/13]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/09]NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/08]ES12.11.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]US3457193  (TINSLEY SAMUEL W, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,13,15,16,23,26 * example 18 *;
 [A]GB2310211  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-28 * claims 1,5; table 1 *;
 [A]JPH1161034  ;
 [A]EP0897710  (ESPE DENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-28 * claim 1 * * page 4 *;
 [AD]US3388105  (MIKLOS DANIELISZ, et al) [AD] 1-28 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19647848  (TOAGOSEI CO [JP]) [A] 1-28 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5674922  (IGARASHI ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * claims 1-5 * * column 6, line 40 - line 50 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, [A] 1-28 * abstract *