Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1268560

EP1268560 - ROD TYPE POLYMER PREFORM HAVING RADIALLY-VARYING PROPERTIES, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2005  [2005/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optimedia, Inc.
No. 96, Sinmosan-dong Anseong-si
Kyungki-do 456-390 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Optimedia, Inc.
No. 96, Sinmosan-dong
Anseong-si, Kyungki-do 456-390 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, In Bae
Samho Apt. 10-701, Bangbae-dong
Seocho-ku, Seoul 137-759 / KR
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date01922075.521.03.2001
[2003/01]
WO2001KR00445
Priority number, dateKR2000001420421.03.2000         Original published format: KR 2000014204
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0170823
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1268560
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2003/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.09.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B29C41/04, B29C67/24, B29D11/00, G02B6/18, // B29K33:00
[2003/23]
Former International [2003/01]C08F2/00, C08J3/00, B29D11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/01]
TitleGerman:STABFÖRMIGES POLYMERHALBZEUG MIT RADIAL-VARIIERENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAZU[2003/01]
English:ROD TYPE POLYMER PREFORM HAVING RADIALLY-VARYING PROPERTIES, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND APPARATUS THEREFOR[2003/01]
French:PREFORME POLYMERE DU TYPE BARREAU, POSSEDANT DES PROPRIETES DE VARIATION RADIALE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CETTE PREFORME ET DISPOSITIF DESTINE A CET EFFET[2003/01]
Entry into regional phase23.08.2002National basic fee paid 
23.08.2002Search fee paid 
23.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
23.08.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
31.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/12]
27.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8701071  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * page 6, paragraph 2; claim 5 *;
 [X]US5244371  (BELLO JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-2,6-8,11-12 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 52; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]JPS60119509  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-2,6-10 * table 1 *;
 [XA]WO9729903  (UNIV EINDHOVEN TECH [NL], et al) [X] 8-12 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph L; claims 11,13 * [A] 4-5;
 [XA]US5851666  (NONAKA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 8-9 * column 12, paragraph 1 - column 14, paragraph 57; figure 7 * [A] 1;
 [X]DE3726042  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 8,11-12 * example 1; claims 1-3 *;
 [E]EP1116577  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-2,4-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0029] - paragraph [0032]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0658418  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,12 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9811287  (KATOOT MOHAMMAD W [US]) [A] 4-5 * table 1 *;
 [A]EP0909624  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 4-5 * paragraph [0020] *;
 [A]EP0844501  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 4-5 * page 6, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]EP0942301  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 4-5 * paragraphs [0029] , [0032] - [0035]; claim 1 *
International search[E]KR20000061146  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al);
 [A]JPH08304634  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES);
 [A]US5378776  (MATSUMURA YASUO [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH08337609  (KOIKE YASUHIRO);
 [A]EP0130838  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al)