Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1266296

EP1266296 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATICALLY DEPLOYING DATA IN A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interwoven Inc.
1195 West Fremont Avenue, Suite 2000
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
[2002/51]
Inventor(s)01 / BRADSHAW, Robert
803 11th Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
02 / COCHRANE, Kevin
803 11th Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
03 / CUAN, Bill
1195 West Fremont Avenue, Suite 2000
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
04 / PARK, Britt
803 11th Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date01923353.522.03.2001
[2002/51]
WO2001US40361
Priority number, dateUS20000192244P22.03.2000         Original published format: US 192244 P
US20000205805P17.05.2000         Original published format: US 205805 P
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0171520
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1266296
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.09.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2007/42]
Former International [2002/51]G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN EINSETZEN VON DATEN IN EINEM COMPUTERNETZWERK[2002/51]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATICALLY DEPLOYING DATA IN A COMPUTER NETWORK[2002/51]
French:METHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE DEPLOIEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE DONNEES DANS UN RESEAU INFORMATIQUE[2002/51]
Entry into regional phase20.09.2002National basic fee paid 
20.09.2002Search fee paid 
20.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
13.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/34]
30.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US5649200  (LEBLANG DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * column 1, lines 30-51 * * column 7, lines 33-40 * * column 16, lines 31-65 * * column 17, line 30 - column 18, line 8 * * column 18, lines 33-47 *;
 [X]WO9940509  (INTERWOVEN INC [US]) [X] 1-45 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 6 *;
 [X]  - BICKNELL P A, "Software development and configuration management in the Cronus distributed operating system", SOFTWARE MAINTENANCE, 1988., PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON SCOTTSDALE, AZ, USA 24-27 OCT. 1988, WASHINGTON, DC, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PR, US, (19881024), ISBN 0-8186-0879-X, pages 143 - 147, XP010014249 [X] 1-45 * page 144, column R, line 3 - page 145, column R, line 9 * * page 145, column L, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSM.1988.10154
 [X]  - CHIANG S C Y ET AL, "DOCFLOW: AN EVENT-DRIVEN VISUAL PROGRAMMING ENVIRONMENT FOR OFFICE AUTOMATION THROUGH DOCUMENT PROCESSING", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION AND KNOWLEDGE ENGINEERING, CSREA PRESS, ATHENS, GA, US, (1994), pages 454 - 461, XP008067863 [X] 1-45 * page 455, paragraph 3.2.3 * * page 456, lines 36-42 *
International search[Y]US5895476  (ORR MICHAEL B [US], et al);
 [Y]US5913029  (SHOSTAK ROBERT E [US]);
 [YE]US6216212  (CHALLENGER JAMES ROBERT HAROLD [US], et al);
 [A]US5958008  (POGREBISKY MICHAEL [IL], et al);
 [A]US5983268  (FREIVALD MATTHEW P [US], et al);
 [AE]US6209007  (KELLEY EDWARD E [US], et al);
 [AE]US6219818  (FREIVALD MATTHEW P [US], et al)