blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1278666

EP1278666 - WIPER BLADE FOR GLAZED SURFACES, ESPECIALLY GLAZED SURFACES IN MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.06.2006  [2006/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2003/05]
Inventor(s)01 / DE BLOCK, Peter
Pandputweg 5
B-3545 Halen / BE
02 / WIJNANTS, Peter
Stwg. Op Nieuwrode 172
B-3111 Wezemaal / BE
 [2003/05]
Application number, filing date01923504.310.02.2001
[2003/05]
WO2001DE00513
Priority number, dateDE200010827123.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10008271
DE200012571025.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10025710
[2003/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0162559
Date:30.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1278666
Date:29.01.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1278666
Date:20.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2002
ClassificationIPC:B60S1/38
[2003/05]
CPC:
B60S1/38 (EP,US); B60S1/32 (KR); B60S1/3879 (EP,US);
B60S1/3893 (EP,US); B60S2001/382 (EP,US); B60S2001/3822 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2003/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WISCHBLATT FÜR SCHEIBEN INSBESONDERE VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN[2003/05]
English:WIPER BLADE FOR GLAZED SURFACES, ESPECIALLY GLAZED SURFACES IN MOTOR VEHICLES[2003/05]
French:BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR DES VITRES, EN PARTICULIER DE VEHICULES A MOTEUR[2003/05]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2001National basic fee paid 
24.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
16.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2005Fee for grant paid
29.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]DE1028896  (AVOG ELEKTRO UND FEINMECHANIK) [X] 1-5,7,10 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19627115  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]GB2036547  (BREVETS JB SOC D EXPL DE) [A] 1,4-8 * page 1, lines 97-120; figures 1,4,6 *
by applicantDE1505357
 DE29611722U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.