Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1273058

EP1273058 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THIN-FILM BATTERY HAVING AN ULTRA-THIN ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/02]THIN-FILM BATTERY HAVING ULTRA-THIN ELECTROLYTE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD
[2008/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2009
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.07.2009  [2009/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cymbet Corporation
18326 Joplin St. NW
Elk River, MN 55330 / US
[2008/38]
Former [2003/02]For all designated states
Cymbet Corporation
18326 Joplin St. NW
Elk River, MN 55330 / US
For all designated states
Jenson, Mark Lynn
33311 Dolphin Street N.W.
Princeton, MN 55371 / US
For all designated states
Weiss, Victor Henry
376 Waycliffe Circle
Wayzata, MN 55391 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JENSON, Mark, Lynn
28213 128th Street
Zimmerman, MN 55398-9438 / US
02 / WEISS, Victor, Henry
376 Waycliffe Circle
Wayzata, MN 55391 / US
 [2003/18]
Former [2003/02]01 / JENSON, Mark, Lynn
33311 Dolphin Street N.W.
Princeton, MN 55371 / US
02 / WEISS, Victor, Henry
376 Waycliffe Circle
Wayzata, MN 55391 / US
Representative(s)Preuss, Udo
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Preuss, Udo, Dipl.-Ing.
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date01924289.023.03.2001
[2003/02]
WO2001US09436
Priority number, dateUS20000191774P24.03.2000         Original published format: US 191774 P
US20000225134P14.08.2000         Original published format: US 225134 P
US20000238673P06.10.2000         Original published format: US 238673 P
[2003/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0173864
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1273058
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1273058
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01M6/18, H01M10/36, C23C14/48
[2003/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2003/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DÜNNSCHICHTBATTERIE MIT ULTRADÜNNEM ELEKTROLYTEN[2008/02]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THIN-FILM BATTERY HAVING AN ULTRA-THIN ELECTROLYTE[2008/02]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE BATTERIE EN COUCHE MINCE AVEC ELECTROLYTE ULTRA-MINCE[2008/02]
Former [2003/02]DÜNNSCHICHTBATTERIE MIT ULTRADÜNNEM ELEKTROLYTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG
Former [2003/02]THIN-FILM BATTERY HAVING ULTRA-THIN ELECTROLYTE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD
Former [2003/02]BATTERIE EN COUCHE MINCE AVEC ELECTROLYTE ULTRA-MINCE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE
Entry into regional phase24.10.2002National basic fee paid 
24.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.10.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
26.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2008Fee for grant paid
02.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200505   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2005
31.03.200707   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08293310  ;
 [X]GB2318127  (GEN VACUUM EQUIP LTD) [X] 1 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 6 * * page 8, line 9 - page 14, line 5; claims 1,12-31 *;
 [X]JPH076933  ;
 [PX]US6094292  (GEROUKI ALEXANDRA ET AL) [PX] 1-36 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 7 * * column 10, line 29 - column 12, line 31 * * column 13, line 6 - column 14, line 23 * * column 16, line 50 - column 21, line 17; claims 1,4-8,20-23 *;
 [PX]JP2000188113  ;
 [A]US5051274  (ARNTZ FLOYD O ET AL) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 63 - column 4, line 30 *;
 [A]WO9847196  (LOCKHEED MARTIN ENERGY SYS INC) [A] 1-36 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 5 * * page 10, line 29 - page 12, line 17; claims 8-16 *;
 [A]JPS6244960  ;
 [X]  - MARTIN P J ET AL, "MODIFICATION OF THE OPTICAL AND STRUCTURAL OF DIELECTRIC ZRO2 FILMS BY ION-ASSISTED DEPOSITION", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19840101), vol. 55, no. 1, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 235 - 241, XP001053666 [X] 1,3,24 * page 235, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 236, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.332871
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08293310 A 19961105 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07006933 A 19950110 (MARCON ELECTRON CO LTD;OTHERS: 02) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [PX]  - VEREDA F ET AL, "A study of electronic shorting in IBDA-deposited Lipon films", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (200008), vol. 89, no. 2, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 201 - 205, XP004201951 [PX] 1-36 * page 201, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 202, column 1, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(00)00430-4
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000188113 A 20000704 (TORAI ONITSUKUSU KK) [PX] 1,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870723), vol. 011, no. 227, Database accession no. (E - 526), & JP62044960 A 19870226 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-36 * abstract *
 [A]  - R.B.GOLDNER, "Ambient temperature synthesis of polycrystalline thin films of lithium cobalt oxide with controlled crystallites orientations", ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY PROCEEDINGS, vol. 98-15, pages 268 - 273, XP008001908 [A] 1-7 * page 268, paragraph 1 - page 269, paragraph 1 *