Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1274950

EP1274950 - BALL BEARING MECHANICAL DISC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2007
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SRAM Corporation
1333 North Kingsbury Street, 4th floor
Chicago, Illinois 60622 / US
[2008/03]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
SRAM CORPORATION
1333 North Kingsbury Street, 4th floor
Chicago, Illinois 60622 / US
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
Avid, LLC
2875 West Oxford, No. 7
Englewood, Colorado 80110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LUMPKIN, Wayne, R.
7060 W. Belmont Drive
Littleton, CO 80123 / US
02 / MAYBERRY, Michael, T.
1355 Adams Street
Denver, CO 80206 / US
 [2003/03]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01924728.706.04.2001
[2003/03]
WO2001US11141
Priority number, dateUS20000195560P06.04.2000         Original published format: US 195560 P
US2001081115616.03.2001         Original published format: US 811156
[2003/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0177541
Date:18.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1274950
Date:15.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001
[2003/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1274950
Date:16.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.10.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/46, F16D65/18, F16D55/224, F16D66/02, B60T11/04, B62K23/02, B62L1/00, B62L3/00, F16C1/10
[2003/21]
Former International [2003/03]F16D66/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MECHANISCHE SCHEIBENBREMSE MIT KUGELLAGER[2003/03]
English:BALL BEARING MECHANICAL DISC BRAKE[2003/03]
French:FREIN A DISQUE MECANIQUE A ROULEMENT A BILLES[2003/03]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2002National basic fee paid 
06.11.2002Search fee paid 
06.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
03.06.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2007Fee for grant paid
03.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.10.2008   
SHIMANO INC.
77 Oimatsu-cho 3cho
590-8577 Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Felix Christopher, et al
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/48]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.2008   
SHIMANO INC.
77 Oimatsu-cho 3cho
590-8577 Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Felix Christopher, et al
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
D-80335 München / DE
24.11.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.06.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.10.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2735/16
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.03.2011Appeal received No.  T0554/11
13.05.2011Statement of grounds filed
31.01.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
31.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
16.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
CY16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
IT16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
TR16.01.2008
LU06.04.2008
IE07.04.2008
GB16.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
GR17.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
NL01.11.2013
[2014/14]
Former [2010/47]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
CY16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
IT16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
TR16.01.2008
LU06.04.2008
IE07.04.2008
GB16.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
GR17.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2010/37]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
CY16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
IT16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
TR16.01.2008
LU06.04.2008
IE07.04.2008
GB16.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2010/32]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
CY16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
IT16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
LU06.04.2008
IE07.04.2008
GB16.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2009/39]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
CY16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
IT16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
IE07.04.2008
GB16.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2009/33]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
CY16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
IE07.04.2008
GB16.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2009/29]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
IE07.04.2008
GB16.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2009/23]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
IE07.04.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2008/51]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2008/46]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
DK16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
SE16.04.2008
ES27.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2008/43]AT16.01.2008
BE16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
ES27.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2008/42]AT16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
ES27.04.2008
PT16.06.2008
Former [2008/39]AT16.01.2008
CH16.01.2008
FI16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
ES27.04.2008
Former [2008/35]CH16.01.2008
LI16.01.2008
ES27.04.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2648765  (TOKICO LTD) [X] 1,9 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 3; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3998295  (MARTIN THOMAS C) [A] 1,2,9,10 * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 30; figures 7,12,13 *;
 [E]US6334513  (CHERN BANG-SHIONG) [E] 1,9 * column 2, line 32 - line 62; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4162720  (HARAIKAWA TETSUO) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 31; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4356897  (URBAN JOHN A) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 54; figure 3 *
International search[X]US3998295  ;
 [A]US4061208  ;
 [A]US2379796  ;
 [A]US4356897  ;
 [A]US5632362  ;
 [AE]US6230849
ExaminationWO9947409