Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1284784

EP1284784 - DEVICE FOR SHIELDING AGAINST RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alishahi, Ali
Hans Taborsky Strasse 5
2440 Gramatneusiedel / AT
[2013/20]
Former [2003/09]For all designated states
Alishahi, Ali
Otto Bauergasse 17/20
1060 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/09]
Representative(s)Babeluk, Michael
Patentanwalt
Florianigasse 26/3
1080 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]Babeluk, Michael
Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17
1150 Wien / AT
Former [2007/24](deleted)
...
Former [2003/09]Hehenberger, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing., Patentanwalt
Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date01925178.419.04.2001
[2003/09]
WO2001AT00117
Priority number, dateAT2000000070220.04.2000         Original published format: AT 7022000
[2003/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0180944
Date:01.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1284784
Date:26.02.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/16, E04H9/12
[2003/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSCHIRMEN GEGEN STRAHLEN[2003/09]
English:DEVICE FOR SHIELDING AGAINST RADIATION[2003/09]
French:DISPOSITIF DE BLINDAGE CONTRE LES RAYONNEMENTS[2003/09]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2002National basic fee paid 
20.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.11.2002Examination requested  [2004/38]
03.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination20.02.2015Appeal received No.  T1053/15
21.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
19.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
18.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
13.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
03.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
09.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
21.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
25.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200404   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2004
30.04.200909   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2009
30.04.201010   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2010
30.04.201111   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2897668  (PHILLIP GRAHAM) [X] 1 * column 4, line 57 - line 65 * * column 9, line 12 - line 30 * * column 13, line 11 - line 27 * [Y] 2,4,10;
 [XA]US5695443  (BRENT ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A * * column 6, line 42 - column 48 * * figure - * [A] 8,9;
 [Y]US3212220  (BONIECKI KRYSTYNA W, et al) [Y] 2,4,10 * column W *;
 [A]US4686804  (SMITH RANDLEY A [US]) [A] 1,2,10 * column W *
by applicantUS2897668
 DE4026403