Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1355789

EP1355789 - SYSTEM FOR IMAGE ENCODING AND DECODING AND THE PRINTABLE SECURITY DEVICE PRODUCED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2010
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.04.2010  [2010/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canadian Bank Note Company, Limited
145 Richmond Road Ottawa
Ontario K1Z 1A1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]For all designated states
CANADIAN BANK NOTE COMPANY, LTD.
145 Richmond Road
Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 1A1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / MERRY, Trevor
42 Seymour Avenue
Nepean, Ontario K2E 6P9 / CA
02 / BUZULOIU, Ileana
3 Beaver Ridge
Ottawa, Ontario K2E 6C6 / CA
 [2003/44]
Representative(s)Hagström, Lena
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 1344
751 43 Uppsala / SE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Hagström, Lena
Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344
751 43 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date01925250.117.04.2001
[2003/44]
WO2001CA00525
Priority number, dateUS2000055345419.04.2000         Original published format: US 553454
[2003/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0180512
Date:25.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1355789
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001
[2003/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41M3/14
[2003/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/44]
Extension statesAL09.11.2002
LT09.11.2002
LV09.11.2002
MK09.11.2002
RO09.11.2002
SI09.11.2002
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BILDKODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG UND DRUCKBARES SICHERHEITSPRODUKT DARAUS[2003/44]
English:SYSTEM FOR IMAGE ENCODING AND DECODING AND THE PRINTABLE SECURITY DEVICE PRODUCED THEREFROM[2003/44]
French:SYSTEME DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE D'IMAGE, ET DISPOSITIF SECURISE IMPRIMABLE OBTENU A PARTIR DUDIT SYSTEME[2003/44]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2002National basic fee paid 
09.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/44]
29.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/17]
10.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200909   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]CH399786  (TELEREGISTER CORP [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 3, line 61 - page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 100 - page 5, line 11; figures 1-9 *;
 [DA]EP0520363  (CANADIAN BANK NOTE CO LTD [CA]) [DA] 1-18 * column 3, line 17 - line 37; figure - *;
 [DA]CA1172282  ;
 [DA]US5708717  (ALASIA ALFRED [US]) [DA] 1-18 * column 8, line 8 - line 51; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]WO9949420  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 5, line 17 - page 9, line 27; figure - *
 [DA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 36, Database accession no. 1984-219356, XP002237528 & CA1172282 A 19840807 (CANADIAN BANK NOTE CO LTD) [DA] 1-18 * abstract *
by applicantCA1172282
 CA2071795
 EP0520363
 WO9949420
 US6636614
 US5708717