Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260037

EP1260037 - METHOD, MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM, AND STATION FOR OPERATING A CONNECTION BETWEEN TWO STATIONS OF THE MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/48]METHOD, MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM, AND STATION FOR DETERMINING A TIMING ADVANCE FOR A CONNECTION BETWEEN TWO STATIONS
[2005/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.07.2006  [2006/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KÖHN, Reinhard
Homburger Str.21
14197 Berlin / DE
02 / PURAT, Marcus
Ferdinandstr.13
12209 Berlin / DE
03 / SCHNIEDENHARN, Jörg
An der Havelspitze 23
13587 Berlin / DE
04 / TRAYNARD, Jean-Michel
Spicherenstr.14
81667 München / DE
05 / ULRICH, Thomas
Rudolf-Bart-Siedlung 11
67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE
 [2003/01]
Former [2002/48]01 / KÖHN, Reinhard
Homburger Str.21
14197 Berlin / DE
02 / PURAT, Marcus
Ferdinandstr.13
12209 Berlin / DE
03 / SCHNIEDENHARN, Jörg
An der Havelspitze 23
13587 Berlin / DE
04 / TRAYNARD, Jean-Michel
Spicherenstr.14
81667 München / DE
05 / ULRICH, Thomas
Sandhauser Str.109b
13505 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date01925295.623.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001DE00710
Priority number, dateDE200010940128.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10009401
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0165729
Date:07.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260037
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260037
Date:10.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04J3/06
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, MOBILFUNKSYSTEM UND STATION ZUM BETRIEB EINER VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI STATIONEN DES MOBILFUNKSYSTEMS[2005/10]
English:METHOD, MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM, AND STATION FOR OPERATING A CONNECTION BETWEEN TWO STATIONS OF THE MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM[2005/10]
French:PROCEDE, SYSTEME DE RADIOTELEPHONIE ET STATION POUR CONDUIRE UNE LIAISON ENTRE DEUX STATIONS D UN SYSTEME DE RADIOTELEPHONIE[2005/10]
Former [2002/48]VERFAHREN, MOBILFUNKSYSTEM UND STATION ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINER VORHALTEZEIT FÜR EINE VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI STATIONEN
Former [2002/48]METHOD, MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM, AND STATION FOR DETERMINING A TIMING ADVANCE FOR A CONNECTION BETWEEN TWO STATIONS
Former [2002/48]PROCEDE, SYSTEME DE RADIOTELEPHONIE ET STATION POUR DETERMINER UN TEMPS D'ACTION DERIVEE POUR UNE LIAISON ENTRE DEUX STATIONS
Entry into regional phase19.07.2002National basic fee paid 
19.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
20.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2005Fee for grant paid
06.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES21.11.2005
[2006/14]
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9608885  (IONICA INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,10-12 * page 2, lines 1-8 * * page 2, lines 18-23 * * page 3, lines 1-9; claims 1-7 * [Y] 6,7;
 [X]JPS5836034  ;
 [Y]WO9803030  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [Y] 6,7 * page 1, line 9 - line 24; claims 1,6,7 *;
 [A]US5959980  (SCOTT LOGAN [US]) [A] 1,11,12 * column 10, line 52 - column 11, line 8 *;
 [A]US5479409  (DUPUY BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 15 *;
 [A]WO9960742  (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * page 5, line 2 - line 14 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 9 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830519), vol. 007, no. 115, Database accession no. (E - 176), [X] 1,11,12 * abstract *