Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1261465

EP1261465 - EXTERIOR MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BFS Betonfertigteilesysteme GmbH
Dr.-Georg-Spohn-Strasse 31
89143 Blaubeuren / DE
[2004/31]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Baumgärtner GmbH
Machinenfrabrik
89143 Blaubeuren / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HIRLINGER, Meinrad
Zehntweg 2
72393 Burladingen-Melchingen / DE
 [2002/49]
Representative(s)Herzog, Markus , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patentanwälte
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01925374.905.03.2001
[2002/49]
WO2001EP02469
Priority number, dateDE200011091706.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10010917
[2002/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0166326
Date:13.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1261465
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001
[2002/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1261465
Date:11.08.2004
Language:DE
[2004/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:B28B7/00, B28B21/82
[2002/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FORMMANTEL[2002/49]
English:EXTERIOR MOLD[2002/49]
French:SURMOULE[2002/49]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2002National basic fee paid 
05.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
14.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2004Fee for grant paid
06.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.08.2004
TR11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
CY05.03.2005
GB05.03.2005
LU05.03.2005
SE06.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/20]FI11.08.2004
TR11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
CY05.03.2005
GB05.03.2005
SE06.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/10]FI11.08.2004
TR11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
GB05.03.2005
SE06.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/51]FI11.08.2004
TR11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
GB05.03.2005
SE06.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/23]FI11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
GB05.03.2005
SE06.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]FI11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
GB05.03.2005
SE06.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/13]FI11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
GB05.03.2005
SE06.03.2005
Former [2005/50]FI11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
SE06.03.2005
Former [2005/22]FI11.08.2004
DK11.11.2004
GR11.11.2004
Former [2005/18]FI11.08.2004
GR11.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI11.08.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS5711015  (TOYO ZOUKI KK) [Y] 1,4,8-10,14-16 * figures 3-6 *;
 [Y]GB675297  (LIVINGSTON CONSTRUCTION COMPAN) [Y] 1,4,8-10 * page 2, line 42 - line 85 * * page 2, line 102 - line 111 * * page 2, line 120 - page 3, line 13 * * figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *;
 [Y]US4178338  (BONDPERS PER-ERIK [SE], et al) [Y] 14,15 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]NL6901529  (J. VAN DER HELM) [Y] 16 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS55133909  (KITAMURA HIROSHI) [A] 1,4,5 * figures 1-4 *