Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1277594

EP1277594 - LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.03.2006  [2006/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2003/04]For all designated states
Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6070 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MASE, Hiroshi
c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura
Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP
02 / HIROSE, Sumio
c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura
Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Yuko
c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura
Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP
04 / MATSUMOTO, Katsuru
10, Sunakoda, Housono, Seika-cho
Souraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0241 / JP
05 / SANADA, Takayuki
c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura
Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP
 [2003/04]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/04]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01925987.826.04.2001
[2003/04]
WO2001JP03658
Priority number, dateJP2000013053028.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000130530
JP2000034145709.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000341457
[2003/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0183234
Date:08.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1277594
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001
[2003/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1277594
Date:06.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.11.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41N1/14, G03F7/00, B41C1/10
[2003/24]
Former International [2003/04]B41N1/14, G03F7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:LITHOGRAPHISCHE DRUCKPLATTE[2003/04]
English:LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE[2003/04]
French:PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE[2003/04]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2002Translation filed 
25.01.2002National basic fee paid 
25.01.2002Search fee paid 
25.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2002Examination requested  [2003/04]
08.01.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
30.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2005Fee for grant paid
27.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04029697.2  / EP1514696
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH11240273  (AGFA GEVAERT NV);
 [X]JPH09244237  (TOYO INK MFG CO);
 [X]JPH09218506  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [X]JPS56130753  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD, et al);
 [XP]JP2001022066  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC);
 [A]US3877948  (YONEZAWA TERUHIKO, et al);
 [A]JPS478657
by applicantJPH0720629
 JPH08282142
 JPH07314934
 JPH06199064
 US3793033
 JPH09127683
 JPH09171249
 US3476937
 JPH071850