Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1286808 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1286808



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 710
10.11.2014 Closing of application Search / examination 2
07.08.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.02.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.09.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 34
02.09.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 34
31.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.07.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.07.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
29.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 39
27.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 40
26.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.06.2013 Claims Appeal 3
26.06.2013 Claims Appeal 16
26.06.2013 Claims Appeal 3
26.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
26.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.02.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 21
14.02.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.03.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
01.03.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 6
08.11.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
03.11.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
17.10.2011 F3050 Request to sign the notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.09.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
26.07.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.07.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.07.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
22.06.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
21.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.04.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
24.03.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.02.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
18.02.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
18.02.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.01.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.01.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.01.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
23.12.2010 Description Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 11
02.09.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
24.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.08.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.02.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.01.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
15.01.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
04.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
04.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
04.07.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.06.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
06.05.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.05.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.04.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.04.2008 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 7
12.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
28.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.05.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.01.2005 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
11.01.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.01.2005 European search report Search / examination 1
30.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.12.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.11.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.11.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
21.10.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.10.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.10.2004 Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application Search / examination 2
06.10.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 22
27.05.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
15.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 86
13.05.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.05.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 8
22.01.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.01.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
14.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.12.2002 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.07.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
25.07.2002 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
14.12.2001 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 86
06.12.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.11.2001 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 22
20.11.2001 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
20.11.2001 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
29.10.2001 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 3
16.05.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.05.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 2
16.05.2001 Description International Searching Authority 14
16.05.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 4