blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1287611

EP1287611 - AMPLIFIER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2011
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.2011  [2011/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
870 Winter Street
Waltham MA 02451-1449 / US
[2010/11]
Former [2004/16]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US
Former [2003/10]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
141 Spring Street
Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALLEY, Gary, D.
604 Greentree Road
Rolla, Missouri 65401-4662 / US
 [2003/21]
Former [2003/10]01 / ALLEY, Gary, D.
17 Holton Circle
Londonderry, NH 03053 / US
Representative(s)Jackson, David Spence
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/10]Jackson, David Spence
REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road
London, WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date01926885.311.04.2001
[2003/10]
WO2001US11873
Priority number, dateUS2000054754812.04.2000         Original published format: US 547548
[2003/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0180420
Date:25.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1287611
Date:05.03.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1287611
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:H03F1/00
[2003/10]
CPC:
H03F1/0288 (EP,US); H03F2200/198 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2003/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERSTÄRKERSCHALTUNG[2003/10]
English:AMPLIFIER CIRCUIT[2003/10]
French:CIRCUIT AMPLIFICATEUR[2003/10]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2002National basic fee paid 
04.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
21.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2010Fee for grant paid
29.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200303   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0630104  (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [X] 1-24 * column 9, line 34 - column 14, line 13; figures 2,4 *;
 [X]WO9720385  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * figures 2,6 *;
 [A]US5757229  (MITZLAFF JAMES EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-24* figures 1,2,6 *;
 [X]US5786727  (SIGMON BERNARD EUGENE [US]) [X] 1-24 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.