Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255828

EP1255828 - SMALL OLIGONUCLEOTIDES WITH ANTI-TUMOR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2005  [2005/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Board of Regents, The University of Texas System
201 West 7th Street
Austin, TX 78701 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Board of Regents, The University of Texas System
201 West 7th Street
Austin Texas 78701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TARI, Ana, M.
2405 McClendon Street
Houston, TX 77030 / US
02 / LOPEZ-BERESTEIN, Gabriel
122 Bellaire Court
Bellaire, TX 77401 / US
03 / GUTIERREZ-PUENTE, Yolanda
7304 Staffordshire 1
Houston, TX 77030 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patentanwälte PartmbB
Herzogspitalstrasse 11
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr.
Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte, Müllerstrasse 1
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date01927361.420.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001US40159
Priority number, dateUS2000050697918.02.2000         Original published format: US 506979
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0160998
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255828
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/11, A61K48/00, A61K9/127
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KURZE OLIGONUKLEOTIDE MIT ANTITUMOR-WIRKUNG[2002/46]
English:SMALL OLIGONUCLEOTIDES WITH ANTI-TUMOR ACTIVITY[2002/46]
French:PETITS OLIGONUCLEOTIDES EXER ANT UNE ACTIVITE ANTITUMORALE[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2002National basic fee paid 
28.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
25.10.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/12]
20.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO9814172  (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * claims 1-20 *;
 [AD]US5734033  (REED JOHN [US]) [AD] 1-20 * claims 1-13 * * column 19 - column 23 *;
 [A]WO9856905  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-14,25-30 *;
 [A]  - COTTER F E ET AL, "Human Bcl-2 antisense therapy for lymphomas", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. GENE STRUCTURE AND EXPRESSION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991210), vol. 1489, no. 1, ISSN 0167-4781, pages 97 - 106, XP004275525 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4781(99)00139-6
 [A]  - JANSEN B ET AL, "BCL-2 ANTISENSE THERAPY CHEMOSENSITIZES HUMAN MELANOMA IN SCID MICE", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, (1998), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 232 - 234, XP001002592 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0298-232
 [A]  - ZEGLER A ET AL, "Induction of apoptosis in small cell lung cancer cells by antisense oligodeoxynucleotide targeting the Bcl-2 coding sequence", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, US DEPT. OF HEALTH, EDICATIONAND WELFARE, PUBLIC HEALTH, US, (19970716), vol. 89, no. 14, ISSN 0027-8874, pages 1027 - 1036, XP002080869 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/89.14.1027
 [A]  - GLEAVE M E ET AL, "TARGETING BCL-2 GENE TO DELAY ANDROGEN-INDEPENDENT PROGRESSION AND ENHANCE CHEMOSENSITIVITY IN PROSTATE CANCER USING ANTISENSE BCL-2 OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDES", UROLOGY, BELLE MEAD, NJ, US, (199912), vol. 54, no. 6A, SUPPL, ISSN 0090-4295, pages 36 - 46, XP000964819 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(99)00453-7