Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240598

EP1240598 - METHOD FOR SELECTING GOODS/SERVICES IN TRADE MARK TRANSACTION PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Franks, Robert Benjamin
Walker Edge Farm Walker Edge
Bolsterstone S36 4ZA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Franks, Robert Benjamin
Walker Edge Farm
Walker Edge, Bolsterstone S36 4ZA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Franks, Robert Benjamin
Walker Edge Farm
Walker Edge Bolsterstone S36 4ZA / GB
02 / Neilson, Martin
Thorpe Edge Mansion Thorpe Lane
Almondbury Huddersfield HD5 8TA / GB
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Franks, Robert Benjamin
Franks & Co Limited
15 Jessops Riverside
Brightside Lane
Sheffield S9 2RX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Franks, Robert Benjamin
Franks & Co. 8-10 President Buildings Saville Street East
Sheffield South Yorkshire S4 7UQ / GB
Application number, filing date01928068.408.05.2001
[2002/38]
WO2001GB01974
Priority number, dateGB2000001124511.05.2000         Original published format: GB 0011245
GB2000001721714.07.2000         Original published format: GB 0017217
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0186475
Date:15.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240598
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUSWÄHLEN VON GÜTERN UND DIENSTEN IN EINER TRANSAKTIONSVERARBEITUNG FÜR EINGETRAGENE WARENZEICHEN[2002/38]
English:METHOD FOR SELECTING GOODS/SERVICES IN TRADE MARK TRANSACTION PROCESSING[2002/38]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT LA SELECTION DE BIENS/SERVICES LORS DU TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTIONS CONCERNANT LES MARQUES DE COMMERCE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2002National basic fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
07.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2003/33]