Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1294831

EP1294831 - WIDE CUT FISCHER-TROPSCH DIESEL FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.02.2010
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2010Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.03.2010  [2010/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/13]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BERLOWITZ, Paul, Joseph
4 Nicole Terrace
Glen Gardner, NJ 08826 / US
02 / WITTENBRINK, Robert, Jay
6018 Riverchase Trail
Kingwood, TX 77345 / US
03 / RYAN, Daniel, Francis
6211 Gabriel Oaks Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US
04 / GENETTI, William, Berlin
15812 Stillwater
Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US
05 / JOHNSON, Jack, Wayne
9 Sunrise Circle
Clinton, NJ 08809 / US
 [2003/13]
Representative(s)Troch, Geneviève
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2003/13]Troch, Geneviève
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date01928419.910.04.2001
[2003/13]
WO2001US11560
Priority number, dateUS2000056245402.05.2000         Original published format: US 562454
[2003/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0183647
Date:08.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1294831
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001
[2003/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/08
[2003/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/13]
TitleGerman:FISCHER-TROPSCH DIESELBRENNSTOFFE MIT BREITEM SIEDEBEREICH[2003/13]
English:WIDE CUT FISCHER-TROPSCH DIESEL FUELS[2003/13]
French:CARBURANTS DIESEL DE FISCHER-TROPSCH DE LARGE COUPE[2003/13]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2002National basic fee paid 
02.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/13]
20.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/12]
05.02.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/12]
05.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
12.02.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination15.01.2008Appeal received No.  T0944/08
25.03.2008Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0020535  (SASOL TECH PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * claims 24,25 * * table 6 *;
 [A]WO9214804  (CENTURY OILS AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-10,13,14,17 * claims 1,3 * * page 4, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]WO9805740  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1,8-13,19,20 * claims 1,7,8,13 *;
 [A]WO0012654  (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) [A] 1,8-11,13,14,19,20 * claims 1-3,8,33-35,38,39,41,44 *