blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1259756 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1259756



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 168
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
13.07.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.04.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
03.04.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.10.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
15.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
18.10.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
08.08.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
08.08.2003 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
25.06.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
16.10.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.10.2002 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
14.10.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
07.10.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.10.2002 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
02.10.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
12.08.2002 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
26.07.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
26.07.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.06.2002 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.06.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.06.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.06.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.06.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.06.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.06.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.06.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.06.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.06.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.06.2002 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.06.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.06.2002 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.05.2002 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2002 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.05.2002 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2002 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2002 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.04.2002 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
28.02.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 10
28.02.2002 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.02.2002 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2002 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.10.2001 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.10.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.09.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.09.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.09.2001 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 16
06.09.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
25.05.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
25.05.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 4
25.05.2001 Description International Searching Authority 7
25.05.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 4
07.04.2001 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1