blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1259756


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.07.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.08.2006  [2006/33]
30.03.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.03.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
13.10.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.03.2003 Renewal fee
11.10.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
11.10.2002 Request for examination filed published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
09.08.2002 Amendment by applicant
09.08.2002 Change - extension states
09.08.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
13.06.2001 PCT data prior to European publication