blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1259756
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1259756Global Dossier 27.11.2002A2
Priority number Date
EP0102244 28.02.2001
AT3132000 29.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0204206 28.04.2003A2
Priority number Date
EP0102244 28.02.2001
AT3132000 29.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL357189 26.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
EP0102244 28.02.2001
AT3132000 29.02.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0165171Global Dossier 28.02.2002A3
WO0165171 07.09.2001A2
Priority number Date
AT3132000 29.02.2000