Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259756

EP1259756 - REFLECTOR ARRANGEMENT FOR A LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LT-LICHT-TECHNIK GmbH
Boschstrasse
33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BARTENBACH, Christian
Rinnerstr. 14
A-5071 Aldrans / AT
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01929372.928.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001EP02244
Priority number, dateAT2000000031329.02.2000         Original published format: AT 3132000
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0165171
Date:07.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1259756
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:F21V13/10
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:REFLEKTORANORDNUNG FÜR EINE LEUCHTE[2002/48]
English:REFLECTOR ARRANGEMENT FOR A LAMP[2002/48]
French:ENSEMBLE REFLECTEUR POUR UNE LAMPE[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2002National basic fee paid 
26.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
17.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/33]
03.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0309832  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 5 - line 11 * * figures 2,4,7; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0122972  (BARTENBACH CHRISTIAN) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 15 - line 16 * * page 2, line 1 - line 9 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [XP]DE19916601  (SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMB) [XP] 1-4 * column 2, line 45 - line 54 * * column 3, line 22 - line 26 * * figures 2,3; claim 3 *;
 [X]DE8106507U  (TRILUX-LENZE GMBH + CO. KG) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *;
 [XY]DE3246547  (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG) [X] 5,10 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 13 * * figure 2 * [Y] 11,12;
 [YA]EP0442246  (TARGETTI SANKEY SPA) [Y] 11 * page 3, line 3 - line 14 * * figure 1 * [A] 5;
 [YA]EP0061527  (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 12 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 28 * * figure 1 * [A] 5;
 [A]US4494175  (GAWAD MAHMOUD A ET AL) [A] 5,10 * column 4, line 42 - line 47 * * figure 4 *
by applicantUS5758954
 US5528478