Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1294991 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1294991



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 760
05.09.2011 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
04.08.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 1
19.05.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.05.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
29.04.2011 English translation of the claims Opposition 4
29.04.2011 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
29.04.2011 French translation of claims Opposition 4
08.02.2011 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
08.02.2011 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
08.02.2011 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
08.02.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
03.02.2011 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
18.12.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
13.12.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 32
03.11.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 13
30.09.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 45
28.09.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.09.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.08.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.07.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.07.2010 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.07.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.06.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.06.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.06.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 15
11.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
03.12.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.08.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2009 Claims Appeal 3
28.07.2009 Claims Appeal 3
28.07.2009 Claims Appeal 3
28.07.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
24.07.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 27
24.07.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
24.07.2009 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
27.05.2009 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
26.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
25.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
15.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
14.01.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
24.12.2008 Claims Appeal 1
24.12.2008 Claims Appeal 1
24.12.2008 Drawings Appeal 1
24.12.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
24.12.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
24.12.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
24.12.2008 Non-scannable object Appeal 7
23.12.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
17.11.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
18.10.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.10.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.10.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
14.08.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
14.08.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.08.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.08.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 15
23.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2008 Drawings Opposition 2
14.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Drawings Opposition 2
13.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
13.06.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
12.06.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.06.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.01.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.12.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.12.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
21.12.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.12.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
21.05.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.05.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.04.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.04.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 13
16.04.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.04.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
16.04.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
16.04.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
12.04.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 18
12.04.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
16.06.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.05.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.05.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
21.04.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
21.04.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.04.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
29.03.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
14.03.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
14.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.2006 Description Search / examination 2
14.03.2006 Description Search / examination 4
14.03.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
14.03.2006 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
14.03.2006 Non-scannable object Search / examination 2
14.03.2006 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
12.02.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.02.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
31.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.08.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.07.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.05.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.04.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
05.04.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
07.03.2002 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.03.2002 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
01.03.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.03.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.01.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
03.01.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
03.01.2002 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 22
04.12.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
07.11.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.11.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.10.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
29.05.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.05.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 3
29.05.2001 Description International Searching Authority 10
29.05.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 1
29.05.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 7
10.05.2001 Authorisation Search / examination 1