blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1293206

EP1293206 - WATER-BASED LIQUID PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.06.2008  [2008/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kissei Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
19-48, Yoshino Matsumoto-shi
Nagano 399-8710 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]For all designated states
Kissei Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
19-48, Yoshino
Matsumoto-shi Nagano 399-8710 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NITTA, Hiroo, Rohto Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
8-1, Tatsumini, shi 1-chome, Ikuno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 544-8666 / JP
02 / NAGAO, Takayuki, Eli Lilly Japan K.K.
Sannomiya Plaza Bldg.,7.1.15 Isogamidori Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0086 / JP
 [2003/32]
Former [2003/12]01 / NITTA, Hiroo, Rohto Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
8-1, Tatsumini, shi 1-chome, Ikuno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 544-8666 / JP
02 / NAGAO, Takayuki, Rohto Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
8-1, Tatsumini, shi 1-chome, Ikuno-ku;
Osaka-shi, Osaka 544-8666 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01930097.914.05.2001
[2003/12]
WO2001JP03976
Priority number, dateJP2000014162215.05.2000         Original published format: JP 2000141622
[2003/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0187298
Date:22.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1293206
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.11.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2005
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/404, A61K9/08, A61K47/02, C07D209/08, A61P27/06
[2005/38]
CPC:
A61K31/404 (EP,US); A61K47/02 (EP,US); A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P27/06 (EP); A61K9/0048 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/12]A61K31/404, A61K9/08, A61K47/02, A61K47/04, // (C07D209/08, A61P27:06)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2004/21]
Former [2003/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGE ZUBEREITUNG AUF WASSERBASIS[2003/12]
English:WATER-BASED LIQUID PREPARATION[2003/12]
French:PREPARATION LIQUIDE A BASE D'EAU[2003/12]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2002Translation filed 
09.12.2002National basic fee paid 
09.12.2002Search fee paid 
09.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/12]
04.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/25]
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0436726  (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [YD] 1-7* page 2, line 19-50 *;
 [Y]EP0600675  (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, line 25-45 *
International search[Y]WO9101718  (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]WO9724129  (ROHTO PHARMA [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPH1025254  (ROHTO PHARMA);
 [Y]JPH1029937  (KOBAYASHI SEIYAKU KOGYO KK);
 [Y]WO9943652  (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.