blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1411004

EP1411004 - ARTICLE REMOVING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.07.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai
5-4, 2-chome, Komagata Taito-ku
Tokyo 111-8081 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai
5-4, 2-chome, Komagata
Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SENDA, Junji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai
5-4, Komagata 2-chome
Taito-ku, Tokyo 111-8081 / JP
02 / SUDA, Kazutake c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Sudax
9-9, Sumida 1-chome
Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-0031 / JP
 [2004/17]
Representative(s)Müller, Gerald Christian, et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]Müller, Gerald Christian, et al
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date01930113.414.05.2001
[2004/17]
WO2001JP03995
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO02092464
Date:21.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1411004
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.11.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2006
ClassificationIPC:B65D83/04, B65D85/60, B65D77/30, B65D51/24
[2004/17]
CPC:
B65D85/60 (EP,US); B65D83/04 (KR); B65D83/0409 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/17]
Extension statesAL22.11.2002
LT22.11.2002
LV22.11.2002
MK22.11.2002
RO22.11.2002
SI22.11.2002
TitleGerman:ARTIKELENTNAHMEBEHÄLTER[2004/17]
English:ARTICLE REMOVING CONTAINER[2004/17]
French:BOITIER DISTRIBUTEUR D'ARTICLE[2004/17]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2002Translation filed 
22.11.2002National basic fee paid 
22.11.2002Search fee paid 
22.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2002Examination requested  [2004/17]
13.12.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
26.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/35]
11.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1179262  ;
 [X]US3622041  (BORSUM WILLIAM K, et al) [X] 1-3* column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 62; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]EP0629562  (LILLY INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 50; figures 1-5 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11079262 A 19990323 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH04189784  (UINGUSU KK);
 [Y]JPS52165852U  ;
 [Y]JPS60101468U  ;
 [A]JPH0375107U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.