Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1290584 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1290584



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 677
02.12.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
26.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.11.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 4
20.11.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.11.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
11.11.2015 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
05.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
05.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
22.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.07.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.07.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 64
20.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.07.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 13
13.07.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.05.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
04.05.2015 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Appeal 1
04.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
23.04.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
24.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
19.05.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
25.04.2014 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 3
19.03.2014 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 4
19.03.2014 Authorisation Appeal 1
19.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 2
26.11.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.11.2013 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
26.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
26.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
05.07.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
20.05.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.05.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
06.05.2011 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
25.02.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.12.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.11.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.10.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
25.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
25.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
25.10.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
17.08.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.08.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
22.06.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.06.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
16.06.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
16.06.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.05.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.05.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.02.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
08.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
08.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.01.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
02.09.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.08.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
02.07.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 25
29.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
29.06.2007 Description Search / examination 1
29.06.2007 Drawings Search / examination 12
29.06.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
24.04.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.01.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.01.2007 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
22.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.09.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2006 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
13.06.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.06.2003 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
22.05.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
22.05.2003 Priority document Search / examination 31
16.05.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
15.05.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
17.03.2003 Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase Search / examination 1
04.03.2003 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
04.02.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
29.01.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.12.2002 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.12.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.12.2002 Refund of fees (PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.12.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.12.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
17.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2002 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
03.12.2002 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
28.11.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.11.2002 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.11.2002 Annex Search / examination 47
07.11.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.02.2002 Notification relating to priority claim Search / examination 1
27.02.2002 Notification relating to priority claim Search / examination 1
11.02.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
01.02.2002 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.01.2002 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2002 Notification of defects in the demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
14.01.2002 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
07.01.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.12.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.12.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.12.2001 Submission concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2001 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.12.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.12.2001 Submission concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.12.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.12.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.12.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
30.11.2001 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.11.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.11.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
21.11.2001 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
21.11.2001 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
15.11.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.11.2001 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 44
31.05.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
31.05.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 6
31.05.2001 Description International Searching Authority 25
31.05.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 12