blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1263562

EP1263562 - METHOD FOR TRANSFER MOULDING POLYMER COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.I.A. Holding AG
Czedikstrasse 27
2000 Stockerau / AT
[2004/23]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
G.I.A. Holding AG
Czedikstrasse 27
200 Stockerau / AT
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
remaplan Anlagenbau GmbH
Siemensstrasse 12
94405 Landau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNIEDERMEIER, Jürgen
Ahornweg 17
94405 Landau / DE
02 / NADAY, Peter
Hopfenberg 29
95500 Heinersreuth / DE
03 / RÜTTNAUER, Rochus, Clemens
Schäuffeleweg 11
94405 Landau / DE
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Naefe, Jan Robert
Patentanwälte Naefe Oberdorfer Schmidt
Isartorplatz 5
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]Naefe, Jan Robert
Patentanwälte Naefe Oberdorfer Schmidt, Isartorplatz 5
80331 München / DE
Former [2003/29](deleted)
Former [2002/50]Solf, Alexander, Dr.
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date01931523.314.03.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001EP02874
Priority number, dateDE200011253215.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10012532
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0168345
Date:20.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1263562
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1263562
Date:02.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2001
ClassificationIPC:B29C45/18, B29C45/60, B29B13/06
[2002/50]
CPC:
B29B17/0042 (EP); B29B7/42 (EP); B29B7/58 (EP);
B29B7/603 (EP); B29B7/845 (EP); B29B7/90 (EP);
B29C45/18 (EP); B29C45/1816 (EP); B29C45/60 (EP);
B29C48/39 (EP); B29C48/53 (EP); B29C48/535 (EP);
B29B2017/048 (EP); B29C2045/605 (EP); B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29K2105/253 (EP); B29K2105/26 (EP); B29L2007/008 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB [2004/23]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SPRITZPRESSEN VON KUNSTSTOFFMISCHUNGEN[2002/50]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSFER MOULDING POLYMER COMPOUNDS[2002/50]
French:PROCEDE DE MOULAGE PAR TRANSFERT DE MELANGES DE MATIERES PLASTIQUES[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase10.09.2002National basic fee paid 
10.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
06.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2004Fee for grant paid
03.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB02.06.2004
[2005/45]
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0375405  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-6,19-24,34,36,46,47,49-51 * page 8, line 46 - page 10, line 51 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]GB996102  (ECKERT & ZIEGLER GMBH) [Y] 1-3,5,34,50 * page 1, line 52 - line 54 * * page 1, line 62 - page 2, line 12 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0309409  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 4,6,19-24,36,46,47,49,51 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 49 *;
 [A]GB1537240  (TBA INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS LTD) [A] 52 * page 2, line 24 - line 25 * * page 2, line 75 - line 99 *;
 [A]EP0342839  (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 52 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE19803422  (REMAPLAN ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,34 * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]WO8907042  (EREMA [AT]) [DA] 1,34 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.