Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1287505

EP1287505 - A UTILITY METERING SYSTEM INCORPORATING A TRANSACTION AUTHORISATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, ES
published on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Vanclare SE LLC
60 Riverside Boulevard
Apartment 407
New York, NY 10069 / US
[2015/04]
Former [2012/41]For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Secure Electrans Limited
65 Chandos Place
London WC2N 4HG / GB
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Secure Electrans Limited
65 Chandos Place
London WC2N 4HG / GB
Former [2003/10]For all designated states
Secure Electrans Limited
3 Park Place, St James's
London SW1A 1LP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / JARMAN, Michael
The Coach House
Balcombe Road
Haywards Heath, West Sussex RH16 1PB / GB
02 / HOWARD, Gavin
10 Park Avenue
Keymer
Hassocks
West Sussex BN6 8LT / GB
 [2012/35]
Former [2003/10]01 / JARMAN, Michael
The Coach House, Balcombe Road
Haywards Heath, West Sussex RH16 1PB / GB
02 / HOWARD, Gavin
10 Park Avenue, Keymer, Hassocks
West Sussex BN6 8LT / GB
Representative(s)Exell, Jonathan Mark
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London
WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/35]Exell, Jonathan Mark , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London
WC1V 7QH / GB
Former [2005/22]Exell, Jonathan Mark , et al
Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2BP / GB
Former [2003/10]Exell, Jonathan Mark , et al
Elkington & Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date01931905.218.05.2001
[2003/10]
WO2001GB02275
Priority number, dateGB2000001239222.05.2000         Original published format: GB 0012392
[2003/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0191073
Date:29.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1287505
Date:05.03.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001
[2003/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1287505
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07F15/00, G07F15/12, G07F7/10, G07F7/00
[2003/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2012/39]
Former [2003/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesAL18.12.2002
LT18.12.2002
LV18.12.2002
MK18.12.2002
RO18.12.2002
SI18.12.2002
TitleGerman:VERBRAUCHZÄHLGERÄT MIT TRANSAKTIONSBERECHTIGUNGSANORDNUNG[2003/10]
English:A UTILITY METERING SYSTEM INCORPORATING A TRANSACTION AUTHORISATION SYSTEM[2003/10]
French:APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE DE MESURE COMPORTANT UN SYSTEME D'AUTORISATION DE TRANSACTIONS[2003/10]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2002National basic fee paid 
18.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
18.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2012Fee for grant paid
16.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013   
Landis+Gyr Ltd
1 Lysander Drive
Northfields Industrial Estate
Market Deeping
Cambridgeshire PE6 8FB / GB
Opponent's representative
Mohun, Stephen John
Mohun Aldridge Sykes Limited
12 Park Square East
Leeds LS1 2LF / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/27]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013   
Landis+Gyr Ltd
1 Lysander Drive
Northfields Industrial Estate
Market Deeping
Cambridgeshire PE6 8FB / GB
Opponent's representative
Mohun, Stephen John
Mohun Intellectual Property Ltd.
13/14 Park Place
Leeds LS1 2SJ / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.05.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition19.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1724/16
29.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
20.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
05.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
IE18.05.2017
IT18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
ES19.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT20.11.2017
DE01.12.2017
GR06.12.2017
[2018/38]
Former [2018/28]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
IE18.05.2017
IT18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT20.11.2017
DE01.12.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/23]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
IE18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT20.11.2017
DE01.12.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/21]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT20.11.2017
DE01.12.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/20]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT20.11.2017
DE01.12.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/17]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT20.11.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/15]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT20.11.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/12]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
CY18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
SE19.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
PT20.11.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/10]GB29.08.2012
AT18.05.2017
FI18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
Former [2018/08]GB29.08.2012
FI18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]GB29.08.2012
LU31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
Former [2017/44]GB29.08.2012
LU31.05.2017
Former [2016/34]GB29.08.2012
Former [2015/32]deleted
Former [2013/13]PT31.12.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]US5146067  (MILLER MARK P ET AL) [A] 1,28-30 * figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 41 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 57 *;
 [A]GB2324898  (PLESSEY TELECOMM) [A] 28-30 * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 22 *