Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1287505 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1287505



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 662
24.01.2018 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
24.01.2018 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
18.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.01.2018 General enquiry Appeal 1
18.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.12.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
17.10.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
17.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.09.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 2
29.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
29.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
29.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
29.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
29.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
29.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
29.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
27.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.06.2016 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
19.05.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
19.05.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
19.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.04.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.04.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.03.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
29.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.10.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
14.10.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.10.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.10.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.12.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
11.11.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.11.2014 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.10.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 7
10.10.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
09.10.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 22
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.01.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
13.01.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
08.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.11.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.06.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
29.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
29.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
29.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
29.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
29.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.09.2012 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
03.09.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.08.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.07.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
16.07.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
16.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.03.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.03.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.03.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.03.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
19.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.09.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.03.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
12.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.04.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.02.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.10.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
23.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
22.09.2008 Description Search / examination 2
22.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.08.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.03.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.03.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.12.2007 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.11.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.08.2007 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
11.04.2005 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
27.01.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
22.01.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.12.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.12.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
11.02.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
22.01.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.01.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.01.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.01.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.01.2002 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.01.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.01.2002 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2001 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.12.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2001 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
06.12.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
04.12.2001 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) International Searching Authority 2
03.12.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.11.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
29.11.2001 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
12.06.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 6
12.06.2001 Description International Searching Authority 16
12.06.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 7