Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1287505


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
13.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2018  [2018/20]
23.03.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
05.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
30.09.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
22.07.2016 Change: Appeal number
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
19.07.2016 New entry: Appeal number
19.07.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
18.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
13.10.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2015 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
19.12.2014 Change - applicant published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
17.12.2014 Change - representative
31.10.2014 Change - representative
15.01.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
26.07.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
31.05.2013 Opposition filed published on  03.07.2013  [2013/27]
22.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2013  [2013/13]
07.09.2012 Change - applicant published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
24.08.2012 Change - applicant published on  26.09.2012  [2012/39]
24.08.2012 Change - designated states published on  26.09.2012  [2012/39]
27.07.2012 (Expected) grant published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
20.07.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.07.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.06.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.07.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.07.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.04.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.02.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.09.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.09.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.07.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.03.2008 First examination report
09.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.05.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2005 Change - representative published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
04.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.05.2003 Renewal fee
17.01.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
17.01.2003 Request for examination filed published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
11.01.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2003 Change - extension states
21.02.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
25.09.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2001 PCT data prior to European publication