Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319108

EP1319108 - ASPHALT COATED STRUCTURAL ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elk Premium Building Products, Inc.
Suite 1000, 14643 Dallas Parkway
Dallas, TX 75240-8871 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]For all designated states
Elk Premium Building Products, Inc.
Suite 1000, 14643 Dallas Parkway
Dallas, TX 75240-8871 / US
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
ELK CORPORATION OF DALLAS
Suite 1000, 14643 Dallas Parkway
Dallas, TX 75240-8871 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KIIK, Matti
2500 Springwood Lane
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
02 / BRYSON, Michael, L.
1320 S.W. 22nd Street
Blue Springs, MO 64015 / US
03 / TOBIN, Robert, J.
121 Oakview Drive
Double Oak, TX 75077 / US
04 / AHLUWALIA Younger
604 Regalwood Drive
Desoto, TX 75115 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Kopecky, Helmut , et al
Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2003/45]Kopecky, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 32/22
1010 Wien / AT
Former [2003/25]Hudler, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3
01309 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date01932857.402.05.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001US14107
Priority number, dateUS2000066325615.09.2000         Original published format: US 663256
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222985
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319108
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:E04D12/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRUKTURELEMENT MIT ASPHALTBESCHICHTUNG[2003/25]
English:ASPHALT COATED STRUCTURAL ARTICLE[2003/25]
French:ARTICLE STRUCTUREL RECOUVERT D'ASPHALTE[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2003National basic fee paid 
11.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
01.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
11.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5965257  (AHLUWALIA YOUNGER [US]) [DX] 1-5 * column W * * column 3, line 34 - line 52 *;
 [A]EP0764748  (GRACE W R & CO [US]);
 [A]US5099627  (COULTON MICHAEL S [US], et al)
by applicantUS5965257