Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1305142

EP1305142 - CLIP NUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gauron, Jacques
P.O. Box 675
Issaquah, WA 98027 / US
[2003/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/18]
Representative(s)Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2003/18]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01933388.901.05.2001
[2003/18]
WO2001US40656
Priority number, dateUS20000213302P22.06.2000         Original published format: US 213302 P
US2001079498627.02.2001         Original published format: US 794986
[2003/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0198033
Date:27.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1305142
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1305142
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.04.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B25B1/00, F16B37/02, F16B37/04
[2003/26]
Former International [2003/18]B25B1/00, F16B37/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLAMMERMATTER[2003/18]
English:CLIP NUTS[2003/18]
French:ECROUS CLIPS[2003/18]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2003National basic fee paid 
20.01.2003Search fee paid 
20.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
04.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2004Fee for grant paid
28.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.07.2004
FI28.07.2004
TR28.07.2004
DK28.10.2004
GR28.10.2004
SE28.10.2004
PT28.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2006/51]AT28.07.2004
FI28.07.2004
TR28.07.2004
DK28.10.2004
GR28.10.2004
SE28.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT28.07.2004
FI28.07.2004
DK28.10.2004
GR28.10.2004
SE28.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT28.07.2004
FI28.07.2004
GR28.10.2004
SE28.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT28.07.2004
FI28.07.2004
SE28.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI28.07.2004
SE28.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE28.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4219064  (LOZANO ANTHONY H [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4676706  (INABA AKIO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]US4863327  (POUPLIER CHRISTIAN D [FR]);
 [A]US5538377  (STEWART ROBERT E [US], et al);
 [A]US4955772  (RECK BERNHARD [DE]);
 [A]US5599148  (HIROSE AKIHIKO [JP])