Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1309909

EP1309909 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO PROVIDE DETERMINISTIC POWER-ON VOLTAGE IN A SYSTEM HAVING PROCESSOR-CONTROLLED VOLTAGE LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.02.2009  [2009/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/12]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68 Sunnyvale
California 94088-3453 / US
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HELMS, Frank, P.
2204 Willow Way
Round Rock, TX 78664 / US
 [2003/20]
Representative(s)Picker, Madeline Margaret
Brookes Batchellor LLP
1 Boyne Park
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Picker, Madeline Margaret
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date01935179.009.05.2001
[2003/20]
WO2001US14907
Priority number, dateUS2000062193124.07.2000         Original published format: US 621931
[2003/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0208874
Date:31.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1309909
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1309909
Date:19.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/26
[2003/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2003/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSORGUNG VON DETERMINISTISCHER ANSCHALT-SPANNUNG IN EINEM SYSTEM MIT PROZESSORGESTEUERTEM SPANNUNGS-PEGEL[2003/20]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS TO PROVIDE DETERMINISTIC POWER-ON VOLTAGE IN A SYSTEM HAVING PROCESSOR-CONTROLLED VOLTAGE LEVEL[2003/20]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL FOURNISSANT UNE TENSION DE MISE SOUS TENSION DETERMINISTE DANS UN SYSTEME A NIVEAU DE TENSION COMMANDE PAR PROCESSEUR[2003/20]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2003National basic fee paid 
21.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
07.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2008Fee for grant paid
21.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]US5086501  (RIVAS MARIO A ET AL) [A] 1,5,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5659789  (SEEMAN THOMAS R ET AL) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 43 * * column 3, line 33 - column 8, line L; figures 1-4 *